RMS International (USA), Inc. v. Anker Play Products, LLC et al
Plaintiff: RMS International (USA), Inc.
Defendant: Leon Summers and Anker Play Products, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv10400
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 16 Electronic notice to counsel: This civil action has been transferred to the Southern District of Florida and assigned civil case number 1:20-cv-21554. (Danieli, Chris)
April 13, 2020 Filing 15 Case transferred to the Southern District of Florida, Miami Division. Electronic case file sent to the Clerk in that district. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 11, 2020 Filing 14 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion to Transfer Case.Venue will be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, Miami Division, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the parties' joint motion, and their prior agreement on venue. See Atl. Marine Const. Co., Inc. v. U.S. Dist. Court for W. Dist. of Texas, 134 S. Ct. 568, 575, 579 (2013) (Indeed, a proper application of 1404(a) requires that [an agreement on venue] be given controlling weight in all but the most exceptional cases.). (Zierk, Marsha)
April 10, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Florida. filed by RMS International (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Joshua C. Krumholz)(Goracke, Mark)
April 10, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Florida. by RMS International (USA), Inc..(Goracke, Mark)
April 10, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by RMS International (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Goracke, Mark)
April 6, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anker Play Products, LLC identifying Corporate Parent IG Design Group for Anker Play Products, LLC.. (Weibust, Erik)
April 6, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Anker Play Products, LLC, Leon Summers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Leon Summers)(Weibust, Erik)
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Anker Play Products, LLC, Leon Summers.(Weibust, Erik)
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Goracke on behalf of RMS International (USA), Inc. (Goracke, Mark)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Anker Play Products, LLC served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Krumholz, Joshua)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold)
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case AO 121 Form submitted to the court for review. (Krumholz, Joshua)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RMS International (USA), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent RMS International UK Ltd. for RMS International (USA), Inc... (Krumholz, Joshua)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8130314 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by RMS International (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copyright Registration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Krumholz, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RMS International (USA), Inc. v. Anker Play Products, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Summers
Represented By: Erik W. Weibust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anker Play Products, LLC
Represented By: Erik W. Weibust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RMS International (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Joshua C. Krumholz
Represented By: Mark T. Goracke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?