Surette v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Surette
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Federal National Mortgage Association and Marinosci Law Group PC
Case Number: 1:2020cv10462
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Referring Judge: M Page Kelley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Dawn Surette. (Russell, Glenn)
March 24, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Responses due by 4/10/2020 (Hourihan, Lisa)
March 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 10, 2020 to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Dawn Surette.(Russell, Glenn)
March 16, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Shireman, Justin)
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Bank of America, N.A., Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Recorded Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - 2006.04.21 Ch. 13 Petition, #4 Exhibit D - BK Docket, #5 Exhibit E - 2009.09.16 Order, #6 Exhibit F - 2008.11.17 Discharge Order, #7 Exhibit G - Assignment, #8 Exhibit H - 2013.11.27 Complaint, #9 Exhibit I - 2013 Case Docket, #10 Exhibit J - BK Docket (17-41097), #11 Exhibit K - BK Docket (17-42113), #12 Exhibit L - Recorded Section 35B Affidavit, #13 Exhibit M - Recorded POA, #14 Exhibit N - Nims v. BANA)(Shireman, Justin)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Bank of America, N.A., Federal National Mortgage Association.(Shireman, Justin)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin J. Shireman on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Shireman, Justin)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (McDonagh, Christina)
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent NB Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A... (Shireman, Justin)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Shireman, Justin)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal National Mortgage Association ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8144186 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Shireman, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Surette v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Justin J. Shireman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Justin J. Shireman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marinosci Law Group PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Surette
Represented By: Glenn F Russell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?