Coravin, Inc. v. Andia, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Coravin, Inc.
Defendant: Andia, Inc., Diana Gershman and John Does 1-100
Case Number: 1:2020cv10506
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Andia, Inc. and Diana Gershman by Coravin, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chafe, Marie)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on motions for default judgment re #7 Notice: Clerk's Entry of Default (Lyness, Paul)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE: Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Andia, Inc.,Diana Gershman (Lyness, Paul)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 Request for notice of default by Coravin, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Atty. Martha Brewer Motley)(Chafe, Marie)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Coravin, Inc.. Andia, Inc. served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020; Diana Gershman served on 3/16/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Coravin, Inc.. (Chafe, Marie)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Chafe, Marie)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages, Injunctive, and Other Relief against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8152408 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Coravin, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Category Form)(Chafe, Marie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coravin, Inc. v. Andia, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Gershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coravin, Inc.
Represented By: Marie E. Chafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?