Ivers v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Henry Ivers
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv10507
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Correct Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Statement of Facts Supporting Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Henry Ivers.(Montes, Mariliz)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Annuity Contract)(Decker, Byrne)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Decker, Byrne)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT Record Lincoln National Life Insurance Company summons served on 2/21/2020, answer due 4/20/2020.. (Kirby, Kyle)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Lincoln National Life Insurance Company answer due 4/20/2020. (Simeone, Maria)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to April 20, 2020 to File Answer by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Decker, Byrne)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Vieira, Leonardo)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.. (Decker, Byrne)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8152440 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint/Service, #2 Exhibit B - Contract, #3 Exhibit C - Creech Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - 12.3.19 Letter, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Filing Removal, #6 Category Sheet, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Decker, Byrne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivers v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Ivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Byrne J. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?