Gottlieb v. Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Peter A. Gottlieb
Defendant: Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv10509
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File (Unopposed) by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Reply)(MacDonald, Ryan)
April 30, 2020 Filing 16 Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Peter A. Gottlieb. (Bridgeland, Brendan)
April 23, 2020 Filing 15 STATE COURT Documents. (McKillop, Matthew)
March 25, 2020 Filing 14 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Responses due by 5/1/2020 (Hourihan, Lisa)
March 25, 2020 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 1, 2020 to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Peter A. Gottlieb.(Bridgeland, Brendan)
March 19, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2015 Policy, #2 Exhibit B - 2016 Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Response letter, #4 Exhibit D - CPI chart)(Reilly, Christopher)
March 19, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Amica Mutual Insurance Company.(Reilly, Christopher)
March 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah N. Rosmarin on behalf of Peter A. Gottlieb (Rosmarin, Noah)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Zavez on behalf of Peter A. Gottlieb (Zavez, John)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan M. Bridgeland on behalf of Peter A. Gottlieb (Bridgeland, Brendan)
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (MacDonald, Ryan)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Antonellis on behalf of Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Antonellis, Anthony)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Reilly on behalf of Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Reilly, Christopher)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Vieira, Leonardo)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Vieira, Leonardo)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amica Mutual Insurance Company ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8152597 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Cout, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(MacDonald, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gottlieb v. Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter A. Gottlieb
Represented By: John P. Zavez
Represented By: Noah N. Rosmarin
Represented By: Brendan M. Bridgeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher M. Reilly
Represented By: Ryan B. MacDonald
Represented By: Anthony J. Antonellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?