C-4 Analytics, LLC v. McKenna Motor Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: C-4 Analytics, LLC
Defendant: McKenna Motor Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10516
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 Certified Copy of #10 Order of Remand to the State Court and Docket Sheet mailed to the Middlesex Superior Court on 4/13/20. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND to the Middlesex Superior Court. (Pacho, Arnold)
April 11, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion to Remand. The Clerk will vacate the removal to the U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts, remand to the Massachusetts Superior Court in accordance with the forum selection clause agreed to by the parties in their written contract, and close this case. (Zierk, Marsha)
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION to Remand and Vacate Removal by C-4 Analytics, LLC.(Conte, Thomas)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 C-4 ANALYTICS, LLCS ANSWER to Counterclaim and Jury Demand by C-4 Analytics, LLC.(Conte, Thomas)
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra N. Mansfield on behalf of C-4 Analytics, LLC (Mansfield, Alexandra)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Conte on behalf of C-4 Analytics, LLC (Conte, Thomas)
March 23, 2020 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. An Answer and counterclaims having been filed in this contract case, the court enters the following pretrial schedule:Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be completed by 5/4/20; Motions for leave to Amend Pleadings & Joinder of Parties must be filed by 6/26/20. Without leave of court, the parties are permitted to serve 30 interrogatories, 30 requests for admissions and 30 document requests, to be filed within the 30 days of the initial disclosures. The court expects responses to be made in thirty days, unless a request for additional time is granted. A party may not notice more than 5 deponents without leave of court on a showing of good cause. All fact discovery must be completed no later than 12/4/20. Dispositive Motions are due by 1/8/21, with Oppositions to dispositive motions due 1/29/21; Reply, if any, by leave of court. If a party intends to utilize an expert, they must file a notice on the docket no later than 11/2/20, in order for the court to consider whether an expert is appropriate and, if so, to alter the existing schedule (Zierk, Marsha)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against C-4 Analytics, LLC by McKenna Motor Company, Inc.. (Hecker, Dustin)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Kelly, Danielle)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McKenna Motor Company, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8154406 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Hecker, Dustin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C-4 Analytics, LLC v. McKenna Motor Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C-4 Analytics, LLC
Represented By: Amy M. Frisella
Represented By: Thomas J. Conte
Represented By: Alexandra N. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKenna Motor Company, Inc.
Represented By: Dustin F. Hecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?