Ridenti v. Google LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ridenti and Paula Ridenti
Defendant: Google LLC and Youtube, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv10517
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 11:548
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Filing 11 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: ALLOWING #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Edith Ramirez. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Vieira, Leonardo)
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 Recommendations for Scheduling Order Joint Motion to Enter Scheduling Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Justin)
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Google LLC, Youtube, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Google LLC, Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc., Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc. for Youtube, LLC; Other Affiliate Alphabet Inc., Other Affiliate XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC.. (O'Brien, Justin)
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Edith Ramirez Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8228513 by Google LLC, Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(O'Brien, Justin)
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam A. Cooke on behalf of Google LLC, Youtube, LLC (Cooke, Adam)
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin P. O'Brien on behalf of Google LLC, Youtube, LLC (O'Brien, Justin)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paula Ridenti. Youtube, LLC waiver sent on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Vallely, Patrick)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paula Ridenti. Google LLC waiver sent on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Vallely, Patrick)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8154408 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Paula Ridenti. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Sheet)(Vallely, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ridenti v. Google LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ridenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Ridenti
Represented By: Patrick J. Vallely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Justin P. O'Brien
Represented By: Edith Ramirez
Represented By: Adam A. Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youtube, LLC
Represented By: Justin P. O'Brien
Represented By: Edith Ramirez
Represented By: Adam A. Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?