Fennel v. RJB Stone Ltd
Plaintiff: Fennel and Amanda Fennel
Defendant: RJB Stone Ltd
Case Number: 1:2020cv10522
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Scheduling Conference previously set for 5/12/2020 is CANCELED as this matter is stayed. (Lara, Miguel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #11 Joint Motion to Stay Pending Settlement Discussions. "Allowed. All pending deadlines and hearings are stayed until July 1, 2020. Parties are ordered to file a status report on the same date." (Lara, Miguel)
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Settlement Discussions by RJB Stone Ltd.(McDonagh, Melissa)
April 27, 2020 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (McDonagh, Melissa)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by RJB Stone Ltd.(McDonagh, Melissa)
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered Granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to 4/20/20 as to RJB Defendant. (Molloy, Maryellen)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 20, 2020 to File Answer by RJB Stone Ltd.(McDonagh, Melissa)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference.... Scheduling Conference set for 5/12/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 19 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RJB Stone Ltd. (McDonagh, Melissa)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Halley, Taylor)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis J. Bingham on behalf of RJB Stone Ltd (Bingham, Francis)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RJB Stone Ltd ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8156510 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(McDonagh, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fennel v. RJB Stone Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fennel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Fennel
Represented By: Michael V. Parras, Jr.
Represented By: Kyle J. Guilbault
Represented By: Elisa A. Filman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RJB Stone Ltd
Represented By: Francis J. Bingham
Represented By: Melissa L. McDonagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?