Ethic Inc. v. Admirals Bancorp, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ethic Inc.
Defendant: Ethic Wealth Advisors LLC and Admirals Bancorp, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10581
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John W. Crittenden. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John W. Crittenden Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8173041 by Ethic Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gershenson, Adam)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 Set Deadlines: Complete Service by 6/22/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Admirals Bancorp, Inc., Ethic Wealth Advisors LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethic Inc.. (Gershenson, Adam)
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8168233 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Ethic Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Gershenson, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ethic Inc. v. Admirals Bancorp, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethic Inc.
Represented By: Adam S. Gershenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethic Wealth Advisors LLC
Represented By: John W. Crittenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admirals Bancorp, Inc.
Represented By: John W. Crittenden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?