Lydon v. Speedway LLC et al
Plaintiff: Maria Lydon
Defendant: Speedway LLC and Speedway
Case Number: 1:2020cv10599
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 15 Defendant, Speedway LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Speedway LLC.(DiSarra, Luana)
May 15, 2020 Filing 14 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Motion Hearing held on 5/15/2020 re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Speedway LLC, Speedway by videoconference. Arguments. Court takes under advisement #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: John Regan for the Plaintiff. Luana DiSarra for the defendants.) (Hourihan, Lisa)
May 14, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #www.public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. NOTE TIME CHANGE ONLY(Hourihan, Lisa)
April 29, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Denise J. Casper: Standing Order Regarding Appearance of Counsel Via Telephone or Videoconference(Hourihan, Lisa)
April 29, 2020 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #www.public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2020 02:45 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
April 27, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the sessions courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #www.public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Courts general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa)
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Speedway, Speedway LLC. (DiSarra, Luana)
April 17, 2020 Filing 8 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting nunc pro tunc #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 4/16/2020) (Hourihan, Lisa)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Maria Lydon. (Regan, John)
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/16/2020 to File Answer re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/16/2020 to File Response/Reply ( Responses due by 4/30/2020) by Maria Lydon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Regan, John)
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Regan on behalf of Maria Lydon (Regan, John)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Speedway, Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(DiSarra, Luana)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Kelly, Danielle)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Speedway LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8171459 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint, #4 Proof of Service, #5 Statement of Damages, #6 Settlement Demand)(DiSarra, Luana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lydon v. Speedway LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Luana DiSarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway
Represented By: Luana DiSarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Lydon
Represented By: Barry A. Feinstein
Represented By: John J. Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?