Jay Cashman, Inc. et al v. Pac Comm., Inc.
Plaintiff: Jay Cashman, Inc. and Lucas Marine Acquisition Company, LLC
Defendant: Pac Comm., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv10678
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 27:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2020 03:00 PM before Judge Indira Talwani. Calling instructions will be provided to counsel by the clerk. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) is responsible for ensuring that all parties and/or their attorneys who have not filed an answer or appearance with the court are notified of the date of the scheduling conference. (MacDonald, Gail)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Pac Comm., Inc. served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Basaria, Saraa) Modified on 5/21/2020: Corrected docket text to reflect defendant being served (Kelly, Danielle).
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Weld, Jr on behalf of Jay Cashman, Inc., Lucas Marine Acquisition Company, LLC (Weld, Christopher)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pac Comm., Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Confirm Arbitration Award against Pac Comm., Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8185277 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jay Cashman, Inc., Lucas Marine Acquisition Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet)(Basaria, Saraa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jay Cashman, Inc. et al v. Pac Comm., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pac Comm., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Cashman, Inc.
Represented By: Saraa Basaria
Represented By: Christopher Weld, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Marine Acquisition Company, LLC
Represented By: Saraa Basaria
Represented By: Christopher Weld, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?