Tiefenthaler v. Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC
Plaintiff: Hans Tiefenthaler
Defendant: Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC and Holiday Inn Club Vacations Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2020cv10689
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Holiday Inn Club Vacations Incorporated served on 5/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Paronich, Anthony)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Holiday Inn Club Vacations Incorporated, filed by Hans Tiefenthaler.(Paronich, Anthony)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020. (Paronich, Anthony)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8187696 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Hans Tiefenthaler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Civil Category Form)(Paronich, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiefenthaler v. Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans Tiefenthaler
Represented By: Anthony I. Paronich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Inn Club Vacations Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?