Bay Equity LLC v. Total Mortgage Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bay Equity LLC
Defendant: Denise Peach, Steven Sirmaian and Total Mortgage Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv10693
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 34 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER DENYING #29 Motion for Leave to Take Limited Jurisdictional Discovery and #32 Motion for Leave to File Document for the reasons set forth in Elec. Order 28 . (Kelly, Danielle)
June 5, 2020 Filing 33 Opposition re #32 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Take Limited Jurisdictional Discovery (Dkt. No. 29) filed by Denise Peach, Steven Sirmaian, Total Mortgage Services, LLC. (Hubbard, Jared)
June 4, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Take Limited Jurisdictional Discovery (Dkt. No. 29) by Bay Equity LLC.(Riden, Stephen)
May 29, 2020 Filing 31 Opposition re #29 MOTION Motion for Leave to Take Limited Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Denise Peach, Steven Sirmaian, Total Mortgage Services, LLC. (Hubbard, Jared)
May 28, 2020 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support re #29 MOTION Motion for Leave to Take Limited Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Bay Equity LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Riden, Stephen)
May 28, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION Motion for Leave to Take Limited Jurisdictional Discovery by Bay Equity LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Riden, Stephen)
May 22, 2020 Filing 28 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER DENYING Bay Equity LLC's #26 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand. Affidavits proffered as support for the #20 Motion to Remand should have been filed with that motion and not after the opposition was filed. The court has two briefs from each side addressing the issue of fraudulent joinder. The court will request additional briefing if needed. (Kelly, Danielle)
May 19, 2020 Filing 27 Opposition re #26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand filed by Denise Peach, Steven Sirmaian, Total Mortgage Services, LLC. (Hubbard, Jared)
May 15, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand by Bay Equity LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exh. 1 - Nanci Bunker Aff., #2 Affidavit Exh. 2 - Laurel Caliendo Aff.)(Riden, Stephen)
May 8, 2020 Filing 25 Opposition re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Denise Peach, Steven Sirmaian, Total Mortgage Services, LLC. (Hubbard, Jared)
May 6, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Fraudulent Joinder filed by Bay Equity LLC. (Riden, Stephen)
April 29, 2020 Filing 23 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Fraudulent Joinder. Responses due by 5/6/2020. (Kelly, Danielle)
April 28, 2020 Filing 22 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Fraudulent Joinder for One Week due to Family Medical Emergency by Bay Equity LLC.(Riden, Stephen)
April 24, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Bay Equity LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Riden, Stephen)
April 24, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Bay Equity LLC.(Riden, Stephen)
April 24, 2020 Filing 19 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time #17 . Plaintiff argues that additional time should be granted for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant Peach's Motion to Dismiss #13 because: (1) this court will not have to address the motion to dismiss and the state court can address the issue instead if the court grants Plaintiff's soon-to-be filed motion to remand; and (2) the court may not rule on Defendant Peach's motion until it determines it has jurisdiction to do so. These arguments go to the order in which the court approaches the issues once briefed by the parties, but provide no basis for the extension of time requested by the Plaintiff for its filing. Nor do these arguments go to any burden on the Plaintiff, where Plaintiff will need to respond to Defendant Peach's argument regardless of whether the motion is decided in state or federal court. (Kelly, Danielle) Modified on 4/24/2020 (Kelly, Danielle).
April 23, 2020 Filing 18 Opposition re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to until ten (10) days after entry of an order on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Fraudulent Joinder filed by Denise Peach. (Hubbard, Jared)
April 23, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to until ten (10) days after entry of an order on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Fraudulent Joinder by Bay Equity LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joseph, Hannah)
April 15, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Scott Penner in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Fraudulent Joinder filed by Denise Peach. (Cunningham, Ryan)
April 15, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Denise Peach in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Fraudulent Joinder filed by Denise Peach. (Cunningham, Ryan)
April 15, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Fraudulent Joinder filed by Denise Peach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Hearing Transcript)(Cunningham, Ryan)
April 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Fraudulent Joinder by Denise Peach.(Cunningham, Ryan)
April 15, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Denise Peach, Steven Sirmaian, Total Mortgage Services, LLC.(Cunningham, Ryan)
April 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Beck on behalf of Bay Equity LLC (Beck, Russell)
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Tso Joseph on behalf of Bay Equity LLC (Joseph, Hannah)
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen D. Riden on behalf of Bay Equity LLC (Riden, Stephen)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email.(Burgos, Sandra)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared L. Hubbard on behalf of Denise Peach, Steven Sirmaian, Total Mortgage Services, LLC (Hubbard, Jared)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Malgorzata A. Mrozek on behalf of Denise Peach, Steven Sirmaian, Total Mortgage Services, LLC (Mrozek, Malgorzata)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan W. Fitch on behalf of Denise Peach, Steven Sirmaian, Total Mortgage Services, LLC (Fitch, Jonathan)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Denise Peach, Steven Sirmaian, Total Mortgage Services, LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8188374 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Category Form)(Cunningham, Ryan)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Total Mortgage Services, LLC. (Cunningham, Ryan)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Cunningham on behalf of Denise Peach, Steven Sirmaian, Total Mortgage Services, LLC (Cunningham, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bay Equity LLC v. Total Mortgage Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Equity LLC
Represented By: Russell Beck
Represented By: Hannah Tso Joseph
Represented By: Stephen D. Riden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Peach
Represented By: Ryan M. Cunningham
Represented By: Malgorzata A. Mrozek
Represented By: Jared L. Hubbard
Represented By: Jonathan W. Fitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Sirmaian
Represented By: Ryan M. Cunningham
Represented By: Malgorzata A. Mrozek
Represented By: Jared L. Hubbard
Represented By: Jonathan W. Fitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Ryan M. Cunningham
Represented By: Malgorzata A. Mrozek
Represented By: Jared L. Hubbard
Represented By: Jonathan W. Fitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?