Parra Reyes v. RADM Spaulding Federal Medical Center Devens, MA
Plaintiff: Walis Parra Reyes
Defendant: RADM Spaulding Federal Medical Center Devens, MA
Case Number: 1:2020cv10793
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Walis Parra Reyes, RADM Spaulding Federal Medical Center Devens, MA. (Attachments: #1 Consent)(Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
June 1, 2020 Filing 13 Petitioner's Supplemental MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Walis Parra Reyes in in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241). (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Main Document 13 replaced on 6/5/2020 to correct PDF document view) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
June 1, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by RADM Spaulding Federal Medical Center Devens, MA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Farquhar, Rayford)
June 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2241 by RADM Spaulding Federal Medical Center Devens, MA.(Farquhar, Rayford)
May 26, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Walis Parra Reyes in in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241). (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2020: #1 Exhibit- restricted pursuant to General Order regarding personal identifiers ) (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde).
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. The respondent shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, file a motion to grant or deny the petition and a memorandum in support of said motion. The clerk shall provide the petitioner with the form for Consent/Refusal of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction and the instructions for that form. Counsel for the respondent shall access these documents using the hyperlink found in Docket Entry #4 of this action. The petitioner and respondent shall indicate separately their consent or refusal to the final assignment of this case to the magistrate judge by completing and filing the form entitled "Notice to Parties in Pro Se Prisoner Litigation Cases." (PSSA, 3)
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eve A. Piemonte on behalf of RADM Spaulding Federal Medical Center Devens, MA (Piemonte, Eve)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of RADM Spaulding Federal Medical Center Devens, MA (Farquhar, Rayford)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by RADM Spaulding Federal Medical Center Devens, MA OF FILING OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Farquhar, Rayford)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. 1. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. 2. The Clerk shall serve the petition and the emergency motion on the United States District Attorney for the District of Massachusetts and Rear Admiral Stephen Spaulding, Warden of FMC Devens Warden. 3. The Court is not setting a response date at this time. However, the Court requests that counsel for the respondent promptly enter an appearance to permit electronic service of any docket activity. (PSSA, 3)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION in Support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) : Seeking relief in light of an imminent threat of contracting COVID-19 by Walis Parra Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Currie, Haley)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Walis Parra Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Currie, Haley)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Walis Parra Reyes.(Currie, Haley).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parra Reyes v. RADM Spaulding Federal Medical Center Devens, MA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RADM Spaulding Federal Medical Center Devens, MA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walis Parra Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?