Northeastern University v. Service Employees International Union, Local 509
Plaintiff: Northeastern University
Defendant: Service Employees International Union, Local 509
Case Number: 1:2020cv10825
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Referring Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Filing 17 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Scheduling Conference held on 6/16/2020. Counsel state the status of the case. The court goes over the proposed schedules, and sets the following briefing deadlines. Plaintiffs Motion to vacate award due by 9/15/20. Defendants oppositions/cross motion due 10/15/20. Plaintiffs reply/opposition due 11/5/20. Defendants reply due 11/15/20. (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com.) (Simeone, Maria)
June 11, 2020 Filing 16 Northeastern University's ANSWER to Counterclaim by Northeastern University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Buckley, Timothy) Modified on 6/17/2020 to correct description (Montes, Mariliz).
June 9, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Russell, Ian)
June 9, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Northeastern University. Northeastern University waiver sent on 5/18/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Buckley, Timothy)
June 9, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT STATEMENT of counsel . (Buckley, Timothy)
June 9, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Northeastern University. (Buckley, Timothy)
May 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference.A Scheduling Conference has been set for 6/16/2020 03:15 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling order sample, #2 standing order on summary judgment)(Simeone, Maria)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Northeastern University by Service Employees International Union, Local 509.(Russell, Ian)
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 Set Deadlines: Complete Service due by 7/29/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin added. Judge Indira Talwani no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(MacDonald, Gail)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Service Employees International Union, Local 509. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Buckley on behalf of Northeastern University (Buckley, Timothy)
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Fisher on behalf of Northeastern University (Fisher, Robert)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Northeastern University. (Fisher, Robert)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award against Service Employees International Union, Local 509 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8218975 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Northeastern University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Local Category Form)(Fisher, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northeastern University v. Service Employees International Union, Local 509
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Employees International Union, Local 509
Represented By: Ian O. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northeastern University
Represented By: Timothy J. Buckley
Represented By: Robert A. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?