International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental, and Reinforcing Iron Workers, Local 7, AFL-CIO v. Structures Derek Inc.
Plaintiff: International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental, and Reinforcing Iron Workers, Local 7, AFL-CIO
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Structures Derek Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Kevin Monaghan-Orjuela
Case Number: 1:2020cv10828
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Rya W. Zobel: Scheduling Conference held on 6/16/2020; parties to let court know about settlement; ( Telephone Conference set for 7/7/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Rya W. Zobel.). defendant's answer/response is held off until after the conference;(Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.)(Attorneys present: Long & Deluhery) (Urso, Lisa) Modified on 6/17/2020 (Urso, Lisa).
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 in Advance of Scheduling Conference by Structures Derek Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Deluhery, Megan)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 with Plaintiff and Third-Party Defendant's Proposed Scheduling Order. (Long, Mickey)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of call in # for 6/16/20 16.1 conference at 2:30 p.m.888-675-2535 Access code 7065717 (Urso, Lisa)
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Kevin Monaghan-Orjuela served on 6/2/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (Deluhery, Megan)
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Scheduling Conference REset for 6/16/2020 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Kevin Monaghan-Orjuela. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Kevin Monaghan-Orjuela, COUNTERCLAIM against International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental, and Reinforcing Iron Workers, Local 7, AFL-CIO by Structures Derek Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Deluhery, Megan)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental, and Reinforcing Iron Workers, Local 7, AFL-CIO. Structures Derek Inc. served on 5/1/2020, answer due 5/22/2020. Acknowledgement filed by International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental, and Reinforcing Iron Workers, Local 7, AFL-CIO. (Long, Mickey)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Structures Derek Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Baker, Casey)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Structures Derek Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8220045 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental, and Reinforcing Iron Workers, Local 7, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Form)(Long, Mickey) Modified docket text on 4/30/2020 (Burgos, Sandra). Modified Plaintiff's name on 4/30/2020 (Baker, Casey).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental, and Reinforcing Iron Workers, Local 7, AFL-CIO v. Structures Derek Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Association of Bridge, Structural, Ornamental, and Reinforcing Iron Workers, Local 7, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Mickey Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Structures Derek Inc.
Represented By: Megan C. Deluhery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Kevin Monaghan-Orjuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?