Locus Telecommunications, LLC v. H2OWireless.com et al
Plaintiff: Locus Telecommunications, LLC
Defendant: FastDomain, Inc., John Doe, Domain Pivacy Service FBO Registrant, The Endurance International Group, Inc. and H2OWireless.com
Case Number: 1:2020cv10829
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT APPROVING #14 Stipulation to extend time to respond to complaint filed by The Endurance International Group, Inc., FastDomain, Inc. (Folan, Karen)
June 9, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by FastDomain, Inc., The Endurance International Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Loh, David)
June 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David Y. Loh on behalf of FastDomain, Inc., The Endurance International Group, Inc. (Loh, David)
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed FastDomain, Inc. served on 5/20/2020, answer due 6/10/2020. (Wilkens, Mathis)
May 27, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Domain Pivacy Service FBO Registrant served on 5/20/2020, answer due 6/10/2020. (Wilkens, Mathis)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed The Endurance International Group, Inc. served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. (Wilkens, Mathis)
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mathis L. Wilkens. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Locus Telecommunications, LLC. Document received: Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mathis L. Wilkens. (Chambers, Paula-Lee)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mathis L. Wilkens Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8221140 by Locus Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wilkens Affidavit)(Chambers, Paula-Lee)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Baker, Casey)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Locus Telecommunications, LLC. (Chambers, Paula-Lee)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula-Lee Chambers on behalf of Locus Telecommunications, LLC (Chambers, Paula-Lee)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against John Doe, The Endurance International Group, Inc., Domain Pivacy Service FBO Registrant, H2OWireless.com, a Domain Name, FastDomain, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8220058 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Locus Telecommunications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Signed Verification Page, #2 Exhibit A to Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Verified Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to Verified Complaint, #5 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #6 Category Sheet, #7 AO 120 Form Per Category Sheet)(Chambers, Paula-Lee) Modified attachment descriptions on 4/30/2020 (Baker, Casey).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Locus Telecommunications, LLC v. H2OWireless.com et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FastDomain, Inc.
Represented By: David Y. Loh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domain Pivacy Service FBO Registrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Endurance International Group, Inc.
Represented By: David Y. Loh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H2OWireless.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Locus Telecommunications, LLC
Represented By: Paula-Lee Chambers
Represented By: Mathis Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?