Sabri et al v. Moniz et al
Plaintiff: Aires Da Graca, Omar Mohamed Omar, Faisal Muhidin Tahlil, Conroy Lewis and Reda Sabri
Defendant: Superintendent Steven J. Souza and Superintendent Antone Moniz
Case Number: 1:2020cv10837
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 20 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER DISMISSING CASE entered. (Lara, Miguel)
June 19, 2020 Filing 19 Judge Patti B. Saris: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered.The petition for a writ of habeas corpus (Docket No. #1 ) is accordingly DENIED without prejudice.SO ORDERED.(Lara, Miguel)
June 17, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Antone Moniz in opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Anita)
June 12, 2020 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT by Reda Sabri. (Orihuela, Marisol)
May 29, 2020 Filing 16 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The parties shall provide the Court with the immigration judge's written decision on the Petitioner's application for protection for removal, as soon as the decision is released. If a decision has not been issued by June 12, 2020, the parties shall on that date file a status report with the Court. (Lara, Miguel)
May 26, 2020 Filing 15 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting only as to Exhibit #14 Motion to Seal. Counsel will receive an email within twenty-four (24) hours of this order with instructions for submitting sealed documents for which leave has been granted in accordance with the Local Rules of the U.S. District Court of Massachusetts. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lara, Miguel)
May 18, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Seal Exhibit by Reda Sabri.(Wishnie, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2020: #1 Declaration of Kshithij Shrinath) (Lara, Miguel).
May 18, 2020 Filing 13 Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Reda Sabri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Reda Sabri, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Wishnie, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/27/2020: #8 Sealed Ex. G) (Lara, Miguel).
May 11, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Antone Moniz, Steven J Souza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Johnson, Anita)
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Antone Moniz, Steven J Souza.(Johnson, Anita)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED Notice of Appearance by Antone Moniz, Steven J Souza. (Johnson, Anita) Modified on 5/12/2020 to correct docket text.(Lara, Miguel).
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of Antone Moniz, Steven J Souza (Johnson, Anita)
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Marisol Orihuela. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lara, Miguel)
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Marisol Orihuela Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8228496 by Reda Sabri. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Wishnie, Michael)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. 1. The Court construes the petition as filed solely on behalf of Reda Sabri and the Clerk shall terminate as parties in this action Steven J. Souza, Omar Mohamed Omar, Faisal Muhidin Tahlil, Conroy Lewis, and Aires Da Graca. 2. The Clerk shall open four new separate civil matters and assign them to the undersigned as related to Reid v. Donelan, No. 13-30125-PBS, with the parties designated as follows: (1) Omar v. Moniz, (2) Tahlil v. Moniz, (3) Lewis v. Souza, (4) Da Graca v. Souza. 3. The Clerk shall docket this Order in the instant action and, in addition, in each of the four new matters. 4. The Clerk shall docket the Petition filed in this matter in each of the four new matters with the docket text to read Original Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 28 U.S.C. 2241. 5. In each of the four new matters, each petitioner either must (1) pay the $5.00 filing fee or (2) file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. 6. The Clerk shall serve a copy of the petition on behalf of each Petitioner on the appropriate Respondent and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. 7. The Respondent Antone Moniz shall, within 7 days of the entry of this Order, file an answer or other responsive pleading to Omar Mohamed Omars petition. Petitioner shall file a reply brief within 7 days of the filing of Respondents brief. 8. The Respondents shall, within 10 days of the entry of this Order, file an answer or other responsive pleading to Reda Sabri, Faisal Muhidin Tahlil, Conroy Lewis, and Aires Da Gracas petitions. Petitioners shall each file a reply brief within 7 days of the filing of Respondents briefs. 9. In order to give the Court time to consider the matter, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, Respondents Moniz and Souza shall provide the Court with at least 48 hours advance notice of any scheduled removal of any Petitioner, and any scheduled transfer of any Petitioner out of the jurisdiction.(PSSA, 4)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. STANDING ORDER on 2241 petitions regarding detention and removal of the Petitioner from the District of Massachusetts. (Lara, Miguel)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Vieira, Leonardo)
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Vieira, Leonardo)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 0101-8221571 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Aires Da Graca, Conroy Lewis, Omar Mohamed Omar, Reda Sabri, Faisal Muhidin Tahlil. (Attachments: #1 Civil Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Wishnie, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabri et al v. Moniz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aires Da Graca
Represented By: Michael J. Wishnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Mohamed Omar
Represented By: Michael J. Wishnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faisal Muhidin Tahlil
Represented By: Michael J. Wishnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conroy Lewis
Represented By: Michael J. Wishnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reda Sabri
Represented By: Michael J. Wishnie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Steven J. Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Antone Moniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?