Conformis, Inc. v. AETNA, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Conformis, Inc. and John Michael Schaub
Defendant: AETNA, Inc., and Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv10890
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. King on behalf of Conformis, Inc., John Michael Schaub (King, Jeffrey)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to #1 Complaint. All Defendants answers due July 23, 2020. (Kelly, Danielle)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kierstan E. Schultz on behalf of AETNA, Inc.,, Aetna Life Insurance Company (Schultz, Kierstan)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 23, 2020 to File Answer as to #1 Complaint, by AETNA, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Larose, Stephen) Modified on 6/12/2020: Corrected event type and docket text (Kelly, Danielle).
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M Larose on behalf of AETNA, Inc.,, Aetna Life Insurance Company (Larose, Stephen)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Service of Process filed by Conformis, Inc.. Individual(s)/Entities served: Aetna Life Insurance Company; and Aetna, Inc.. (Paine, Adam)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas)
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Conformis, Inc. (Kelly, Danielle)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8234270 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Conformis, Inc., John Michael Schaub. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Category Form, # Refer to Entry #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Paine, Adam) Modified on 5/11/2020: Removed Corporate Disclosure Statement to properly file in separate entry. (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conformis, Inc. v. AETNA, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conformis, Inc.
Represented By: Adam R.D. Paine
Represented By: Jeffrey S. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Michael Schaub
Represented By: Adam R.D. Paine
Represented By: Jeffrey S. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA, Inc.,
Represented By: Kierstan E. Schultz
Represented By: Stephen M Larose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kierstan E. Schultz
Represented By: Stephen M Larose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?