ZipBy USA LLC et al v. Parzych
Plaintiff: TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC and TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd
Defendant: Gregory Parzych
Not Classified By Court: Jennifer Prokowiew
Case Number: 1:2020cv10926
Filed: May 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Donald L Cabell
Referring Judge: Douglas P Woodlock
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 106 First Opposition re #103 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order and for Expedited Treatment Defendant's Gregory Parzych Opposition and Cross Motion to Plaintiff's and TMA Motion to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Gregory Parzych. (Dionisi, Robert)
September 16, 2020 Filing 105 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Remote Motion Hearing by videoconference held on 9/16/2020 re #82 MOTION to Compel Non-Party MJP Global Technologies, Inc. to Comply with Subpoena filed by TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC, TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, #75 MOTION for Trustee Process filed by TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC, TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd. The court will hold the motion for trustee process and allow further briefing within a week. The motion to compel is granted in part and denied in part for the reasons stated on the record. (Court Reporter: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Cotter, Dionisi, Jr. Blair, Reimer, Mitarotondo) (Russo, Noreen)
September 10, 2020 Filing 104 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #70 Motion to Compel. For the reasons set forth during the hearing, the plaintiff's motion to compel is granted in part and denied in part. As to Document Requests #1, #2, #3, #4, #5, the motion is granted for the reasons noted during the hearing, subject to the protective order in this case. As to Requests #8, #9, #10, the motion is denied where the court credits that the defendant has provided everything in his possession, custody, or control. The court notes further that counsel for the defendant has agreed to conduct this search anew. As to Request #13, the motion is allowed. As to Requests #14 and #15, the motion is denied but the defendant shall supplement his responses to indicate that he has no such documents in his possession, custody, or control. As to Request #16 and #19, the motion is allowed. As to Request #22, the motion is allowed as to any documents that may relate to the defendant's employment at Zipby or other relevant entities. As to Request #23, the motion is allowed as to documents that may reflect the defendant's attempt to access files relating to his employment at Zipby. As to Interrogatories #1 and #2, the motion is denied because the defendant did ostensibly provide an answer to the questions as written. However, the defendant shall supplement his answer to address any inconsistency raised by the plaintiff, e.g., that the defendant was engaged in attempting to secure an NDA between MJP Global and Q-Free America while employed by Zipby. As to Interrogatory #8, the motion is allowed on the ground that the response does not answer in a reasonably clear manner the questions posed. In supplementing his answer to this Interrogatory, the defendant shall provide a complete and fulsome response that addresses the concerns raised by the plaintiff's memorandum D. 71 at 12, which the court finds well founded. (Russo, Noreen)
September 3, 2020 Filing 103 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order and for Expedited Treatment by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC.(Mitarotondo, Julia)
September 2, 2020 Filing 100 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #75 MOTION for Trustee Process , #82 MOTION to Compel Non-Party MJP Global Technologies, Inc. to Comply with Subpoena : This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen)
September 2, 2020 Filing 99 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #98 Motion to Correct (Russo, Noreen)
August 31, 2020 Filing 98 First MOTION to Correct Defendant's Gregory Parzych Motion to Correct the Record as to the filing of the Declaration of Morten Andersson by Gregory Parzych.(Dionisi, Robert)
August 31, 2020 Filing 97 First Opposition re #82 MOTION to Compel Non-Party MJP Global Technologies, Inc. to Comply with Subpoena Defendant's Gregory Parzych, Opposition to the Motion to Compel the Deposition of MJP Global Technologies filed by Gregory Parzych. (Dionisi, Robert)
August 31, 2020 Filing 96 First Opposition re #75 MOTION for Trustee Process Defendant's Gregory Parzych, Opposition to Plaintiff's Zipby USA and TMA Capital Motion for Trustee Process filed by Gregory Parzych. (Dionisi, Robert)
August 31, 2020 Filing 95 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #89 Motion to Take Deposition from Gregory Parzych and Morten Andersson (Russo, Noreen)
August 31, 2020 Filing 94 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #67 Motion for Attorney Fees. Denied for the reasons stated in the hearing and in light of the court finding the conduct of both the plaintiff and defendant to be reasonable with respect to the documents in the possession of the defendant's accountant. (Russo, Noreen)
August 31, 2020 Filing 93 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #62 Motion to Compel. Allowed as to business records relating to Q-Free/TCS and 22 Union Ave. (and any other non-privileged business records discovered on further review by Ms. Prokowiew) to the extent discussed during the hearing and subject to the protective order in place in this case. Fees are denied in light of the court finding the conduct of both the plaintiff and defendant to be reasonable with respect to the documents in the possession of the defendant's accountant. (Russo, Noreen)
August 31, 2020 Filing 92 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part #61 Motion to Quash. As discussed during the hearing, the motion to quash will allowed as to any personal financial information and denied as to records relating to Q-Free/TCS and 22 Union Ave. (and any other non-privileged business records discovered on further review by Ms. Prokowiew), which shall be provided subject to the protective order in place in this case. (Russo, Noreen)
August 26, 2020 Filing 91 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2020 re #67 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendant's Gregory Parzych Motion for Fees as a result of Plaintiff's Failure to comply with Rule 37 filed by Gregory Parzych, #61 MOTION to Quash filed by Jennifer Prokowiew, #70 MOTION to Compel Defendant Gregory Parzych to Supplement Discovery Responses filed by TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC, TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, #62 Cross MOTION to Compel Prokowiew Production and Testimony and Request for Fees from Defendant Parzych filed by TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC, TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd. The court makes various findings and rulings. The parties to talk concerning the items that were not resolved and inform the court by cob 8/31/20 what remains in dispute. (Court Reporter: Kathleen Silva at kathysilva@verizon.net.)(Attorneys present: Cotter, Dionisi, Jr. Blair Reimer) (Russo, Noreen)
August 25, 2020 Filing 90 DECLARATION re #89 Emergency MOTION to Take Deposition from Gregory Parzych and Morten Andersson After Close of Fact Discovery by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Mitarotondo, Julia)
August 25, 2020 Filing 89 Emergency MOTION to Take Deposition from Gregory Parzych and Morten Andersson After Close of Fact Discovery by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC.(Mitarotondo, Julia)
August 25, 2020 Filing 88 Opposition re #70 MOTION to Compel Defendant Gregory Parzych to Supplement Discovery Responses Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by Gregory Parzych. (Dionisi, Robert)
August 25, 2020 Filing 87 DECLARATION re #86 Opposition to Motion, by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mitarotondo, Julia)
August 25, 2020 Filing 86 Opposition re #67 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendant's Gregory Parzych Motion for Fees as a result of Plaintiff's Failure to comply with Rule 37 filed by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Mitarotondo, Julia)
August 20, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC re #82 MOTION to Compel Non-Party MJP Global Technologies, Inc. to Comply with Subpoena of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Mitarotondo, Julia)
August 20, 2020 Filing 84 DECLARATION re #82 MOTION to Compel Non-Party MJP Global Technologies, Inc. to Comply with Subpoena by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Mitarotondo, Julia)
August 20, 2020 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM in Support re #82 MOTION to Compel Non-Party MJP Global Technologies, Inc. to Comply with Subpoena filed by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Mitarotondo, Julia)
August 20, 2020 Filing 82 MOTION to Compel Non-Party MJP Global Technologies, Inc. to Comply with Subpoena by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitarotondo, Julia)
August 18, 2020 Filing 81 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #67 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendant's Gregory Parzych Motion for Fees as a result of Plaintiff's Failure to comply with Rule 37, #61 MOTION to Quash , #62 Cross MOTION to Compel Prokowiew Production and Testimony and Request for Fees from Defendant Parzych, #70 MOTION to Compel Defendant Gregory Parzych to Supplement Discovery Responses : This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. In light of the discovery schedule, a Motion Hearing is set for 8/26/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen)
August 18, 2020 Filing 80 Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #67 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendant's Gregory Parzych Motion for Fees as a result of Plaintiff's Failure to comply with Rule 37 filed by Gregory Parzych, #61 MOTION to Quash filed by Jennifer Prokowiew, #70 MOTION to Compel Defendant Gregory Parzych to Supplement Discovery Responses filed by TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC, TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, #62 Cross MOTION to Compel Prokowiew Production and Testimony and Request for Fees from Defendant Parzych filed by TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC, TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd responses to these motions shall be filed by the cob Tuesday, August 25, 2020. (Russo, Noreen)
August 18, 2020 Filing 79 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell Referred for: Full Pretrial, No Dispositive Motions (ptn). Motions referred: #67 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendant's Gregory Parzych Motion for Fees as a result of Plaintiff's Failure to comply with Rule 37, #61 MOTION to Quash , #62 Cross MOTION to Compel Prokowiew Production and Testimony and Request for Fees from Defendant Parzych, #70 MOTION to Compel Defendant Gregory Parzych to Supplement Discovery Responses, #75 MOTION for Trustee Process . (McDonagh, Christina) Motions referred to Donald L. Cabell.
August 14, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC Notice of Filing of Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Perkins, Richard)
August 14, 2020 Filing 77 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of R. Nicholas Perkins by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Perkins, Richard)
August 14, 2020 Filing 76 AFFIDAVIT Third Declaration of Anthony Karam by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Perkins, Richard)
August 14, 2020 Filing 75 MOTION for Trustee Process by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Trustee Process Attachment, #2 Supplement Trustee Summons for Prudence Financial, Inc., #3 Supplement Trustee Summons for Commonwealth Equity Services, LLC d/b/a Commonwealth Financial Network, #4 Supplement Trustee Summons for National Financial Services, LLC, #5 Supplement Trustee Summons for TD Bank, N.A.)(Perkins, Richard)
August 14, 2020 Filing 74 Proposed Document(s) submitted by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. Document received: Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant to Supplement Discovery Responses. (Mitarotondo, Julia)
August 14, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC re #70 MOTION to Compel Defendant Gregory Parzych to Supplement Discovery Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit)(Mitarotondo, Julia)
August 14, 2020 Filing 72 DECLARATION re #70 MOTION to Compel Defendant Gregory Parzych to Supplement Discovery Responses by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Mitarotondo, Julia)
August 14, 2020 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM in Support re #70 MOTION to Compel Defendant Gregory Parzych to Supplement Discovery Responses filed by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Mitarotondo, Julia)
August 14, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION to Compel Defendant Gregory Parzych to Supplement Discovery Responses by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC.(Mitarotondo, Julia)
August 10, 2020 Filing 69 DECLARATION of Michelle J. Blair by Gregory Parzych. (Dionisi, Robert)
August 10, 2020 Filing 68 Opposition re #62 Cross MOTION to Compel Prokowiew Production and Testimony and Request for Fees from Defendant Parzych Defendant's Gregory Parzych, Opposition to Plaintiffs Zipby USA, LLC TMA Group of Companies Limited and TMA Capital Austrialia Pty Ltd, Cross Motion to Compel Accountant Prokowiew to Comply with Subpoena and Request for Fees on His Obstruction of Compliance with Subpoena filed by Gregory Parzych. (Dionisi, Robert)
August 10, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION for Attorney Fees Defendant's Gregory Parzych Motion for Fees as a result of Plaintiff's Failure to comply with Rule 37 by Gregory Parzych.(Dionisi, Robert)
August 10, 2020 Filing 66 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell Referred for: Events Only (e). Motions referred: #61 MOTION to Quash , #62 Cross MOTION to Compel Prokowiew Production and Testimony and Request for Fees from Defendant Parzych. (McDonagh, Christina) Motions referred to Donald L. Cabell.
August 10, 2020 Filing 65 Opposition re #62 Cross MOTION to Compel Prokowiew Production and Testimony and Request for Fees from Defendant Parzych filed by Jennifer Prokowiew. (Reimer, Nancy)
August 6, 2020 Filing 64 DECLARATION re #62 Cross MOTION to Compel Prokowiew Production and Testimony and Request for Fees from Defendant Parzych by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Mitarotondo, Julia)
August 6, 2020 Filing 63 Opposition re #61 MOTION to Quash and Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion to Compel and Request for Fees filed by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Mitarotondo, Julia)
August 6, 2020 Filing 62 Cross MOTION to Compel Prokowiew Production and Testimony and Request for Fees from Defendant Parzych by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC.(Mitarotondo, Julia)
July 30, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION to Quash by Jennifer Prokowiew.(Reimer, Nancy)
July 2, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Dionisi, Jr on behalf of Gregory Parzych (Dionisi, Robert)
June 26, 2020 Filing 59 ANSWER to Counterclaim with affirmative defenses by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC.(Perkins, Richard)
June 19, 2020 Filing 58 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Gregory Parzych.(Dionisi, Robert)
June 18, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 18, 2020 Filing 56 Transcript of Video Conference Motion Hearing held on June 2, 2020, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com Redaction Request due 7/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2020. (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 17, 2020 Filing 54 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: MEMORANDUM AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION entered.(Beatty, Barbara)
June 16, 2020 Filing 55 RECEIPT: Receipt # 1BST080453 for monies received on 06/16/2020 in amount of $50,000.00, re: #54 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: MEMORANDUM AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION entered. (Coppola, Katelyn)
June 16, 2020 Filing 53 Notice of Service of Process filed by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. Individual(s)/Entities served: Gregory Parzych. (Perkins, Richard)
June 10, 2020 Filing 52 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER adopting #49 Revised Joint Proposal for Scheduling Order. In summary: Fact discovery to be completed by 8/26/2020; Expert discovery to be completed by 10/14/2020; Motions for Summary Judgment to be filed no later than 10/21/2020; and, Oppositions to Motions for Summary Judgment to be filed no later than 11/4/2020. In addition, the Hearing on the Motions for Summary Judgment is SCHEDULED for 12/2/2020 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1.(Beatty, Barbara)
June 10, 2020 Filing 51 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered re #50 . (Beatty, Barbara)
June 8, 2020 Filing 50 Assented to MOTION for Protective Order by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC.(Cotter, John)
June 8, 2020 Filing 49 Amended JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Cotter, John)
June 5, 2020 Filing 48 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Gregory Parzych.(Dionisi, Robert)
June 2, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE CANCELING HEARING: Pursuant to the Hearing held this day, the Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2020 is no longer necessary and is hereby CANCELED. (Beatty, Barbara)
June 2, 2020 Filing 46 Clerk's Notes for Motion Hearing held via Zoom before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Court addresses pending Motion to Stay Discovery #37 . Court grants in part and denies in part #37 Motion to Stay. Parties to provide revised schedule through summary judgment practice no later than 6/8/2020. Court to enter Order extending the TRO as a preliminary injunction without prejudice. (Court Reporter: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Cotter, Mitarotondo, Dionisi) (Beatty, Barbara)
June 2, 2020 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to #37 MOTION to Stay re #16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, DEFENDANTS, GREGORY PARZYCH, MOTION TO STAY THE CURRENT DISCOVERY SCHEDULE AND TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY IN THE NORMAL COURSE OF THE LITIGATION Defendant's Gregory Parzych Reply and Response to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Stay filed by Gregory Parzych. (Dionisi, Robert)
June 2, 2020 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT of Robert F. Dionisi, Jr. by Gregory Parzych. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email exchange, #2 Exhibit Email exchange, #3 Exhibit Email exchange)(Dionisi, Robert)
June 2, 2020 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT of ZipBy USA re #42 Response to Motion, by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Cotter, John)
June 2, 2020 Filing 42 RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION to Stay re #16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, DEFENDANTS, GREGORY PARZYCH, MOTION TO STAY THE CURRENT DISCOVERY SCHEDULE AND TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY IN THE NORMAL COURSE OF THE LITIGATION filed by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Cotter, John)
June 2, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 2, 2020 Filing 40 Transcript of Videoconference Motion Hearing held on May 28, 2020, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com Redaction Request due 6/23/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2020. (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 1, 2020 Filing 39 PROCEDURAL ORDER: Plaintiffs shall file a response to the #37 Motion to Stay the Current Discovery Schedule and to Conduct Discovery in the Normal Course of Litigation no later than 12:00 noon on 6/2/2020. A Hearing is SCHEDULED for 6/2/2020 at 3:00 p.m.: This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #www.public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Beatty, Barbara)
May 30, 2020 Filing 38 DECLARATION re #16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, FOURTH DECLARATION OF GREGORY PARZYCH by Gregory Parzych. (Dionisi, Robert)
May 30, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Stay re #16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, DEFENDANTS, GREGORY PARZYCH, MOTION TO STAY THE CURRENT DISCOVERY SCHEDULE AND TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY IN THE NORMAL COURSE OF THE LITIGATION by Gregory Parzych.(Dionisi, Robert)
May 28, 2020 Filing 36 Clerk's Notes for Status Conference held via Zoom before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Parties to conduct two video depositions during the week of June 1st and copies shall be provided to the Court. The Temporary Restraining Order #26 issued by the Court is extended until 6/17/2020. Initial memoranda re Injunction to be filed no later than 6/5/2020 and replies to be filed no later than noon on 6/9/2020. Hearing SCHEDULED for 6/11/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant's Motion to Post Security #31 GRANTED to the extent that plaintiffs shall post a bond in the amount of $50,000. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. ONLY COUNSEL OF RECORD TO A PARTY TO THE LITIGATION will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available by teleconference to all others, including the media and the public. In order to gain teleconference access to the hearing, such others must sign up at the following address: #www.public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Court Reporter: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Cotter, Mitarotondo, Perkins, Dionisi) (Beatty, Barbara) Modified on 5/29/2020 to add TRO extension (Beatty, Barbara).
May 28, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 28, 2020 Filing 34 Transcript of Video Conference Motion Hearing held on May 19, 2020, before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com Redaction Request due 6/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/29/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2020. (Scalfani, Deborah)
May 28, 2020 Filing 33 DECLARATION re #26 Temporary Restraining Order Third Declaration of Gregory Parzych by Gregory Parzych. (Dionisi, Robert)
May 28, 2020 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #31 MOTION for Injunctive Relief Motion for Post Security Memorandum Opposing Plaintiff's Claim of Irreparable Harm filed by Gregory Parzych. (Dionisi, Robert) (Main Document 32 replaced on 5/28/2020) (McDonagh, Christina).
May 28, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Injunctive Relief Motion for Post Security by Gregory Parzych.(Dionisi, Robert) (Main Document 31 replaced on 5/28/2020) (McDonagh, Christina).
May 27, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Mitarotondo on behalf of TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC (Mitarotondo, Julia)
May 27, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Nicholas Perkins on behalf of TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC (Perkins, Richard)
May 27, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE:This conference will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #www.public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Status Conference is SCHEDULED for 5/28/2020 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Beatty, Barbara)
May 26, 2020 Filing 27 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Cotter, John)
May 22, 2020 Filing 26 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER entered.(Beatty, Barbara)
May 21, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC of Filing Proposed Order for TRO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cotter, John)
May 19, 2020 Filing 24 Clerk's Notes for Motion Hearing held via Zoom before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Court hears argument on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion for Expedited Discovery #2 GRANTED. Parties shall file a joint proposal for a Scheduling Order no later than 5/26/2020. Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #2 GRANTED. Plaintiff to submit a proposed form of Order for the TRO by 5/21/2020. (Court Reporter: Kelly Mortellite at mortellite@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Cotter, Dionisi) (Beatty, Barbara)
May 19, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION re #16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Memorandum of Opposition by Gregory Parzych. (Dionisi, Robert)
May 19, 2020 Filing 22 Second AFFIDAVIT of Anthony Karam in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Cotter, John)
May 18, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION re #17 Exhibit Memorandum of Opposition by Gregory Parzych. (Dionisi, Robert)
May 18, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION re #17 Exhibit Memorandum of Opposition by Gregory Parzych. (Dionisi, Robert)
May 18, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION re #17 Exhibit Memorandum in Opposition by Gregory Parzych. (Dionisi, Robert)
May 18, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION re #17 Exhibit Memorandum of Opposition by Gregory Parzych. (Dionisi, Robert)
May 18, 2020 Filing 17 EXHIBIT re #16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, for TRO, Preliminary and Expedited Discovery by Gregory Parzych. (Dionisi, Robert)
May 18, 2020 Filing 16 First MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Requesting Short Order of Notice, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Expedited Discovery filed by Gregory Parzych. (Dionisi, Robert)
May 18, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Dionisi, Jr on behalf of Gregory Parzych (Dionisi, Robert)
May 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC Regarding Service (Cotter, John)
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING on Motion #2 for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery :This hearing will be conducted by video conference. ONLY COUNSEL OF RECORD TO A PARTY TO THE LITIGATION will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available by teleconference to all others, including the media and the public. In order to gain teleconference access to the hearing, such others must sign up at the following address: #www.public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Motion Hearing is SCHEDULED for 5/19/2020 at 3:30 p.m. before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Beatty, Barbara)
May 15, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's Motion for Short Order of Notice. The Defendant, having been served on May 14, 2020, is hereby ORDERED to file a response to the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery #2 no later than 4:00 p.m. on Monday, May 18, 2020. The hearing is hereby SCHEDULED for Tuesday, May 19, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve defendant with this Order forthwith. (Beatty, Barbara)
May 15, 2020 Filing 11 Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Requesting Short Order of Notice by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC.(Cotter, John)
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Gregory Parzych. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Cotter, John)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit)(Cotter, John)
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Anthony Karam in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Cotter, John)
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Michael Cauley in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Cotter, John)
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Shirley Rodriguez in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Cotter, John)
May 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ( Responses due by 5/28/2020) by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cotter, John)
May 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT by ZipBy USA LLC et al. against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8242068 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd, TMA Group of Companies Limited, ZipBy USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Category Form, #12 USPTO Report, #13 Rule 7.1 Disclosure)(Cotter, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZipBy USA LLC et al v. Parzych
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TMA Group of Companies Limited
Represented By: John J. Cotter
Represented By: Richard Nicholas Perkins
Represented By: Julia Mitarotondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZipBy USA LLC
Represented By: John J. Cotter
Represented By: Richard Nicholas Perkins
Represented By: Julia Mitarotondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TMA Capital Australia Pty Ltd
Represented By: John J. Cotter
Represented By: Richard Nicholas Perkins
Represented By: Julia Mitarotondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Parzych
Represented By: Robert F. Dionisi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jennifer Prokowiew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?