DaSilva v. Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Adegnaldo Leles DaSilva
Defendant: Does 1-40, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing, Inc., Toyota Motor Corporation, Boch T, Inc., Boch New To You, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A, Inc, Boch T, Inc. doing business as Boch Toyota and Boch New To You, Inc. doing business as Boch New to You Used Car Superstore
Case Number: 1:2020cv10984
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE by Adegnaldo Leles DaSilva of Filings with the Judicial Panel for Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Notice that Case Has Been Remanded to State Court, #2 Exhibit - DaSilva's Reply to Toyota's Opposition to DaSilva's Motion to Vacate CTO-99)(Merrigan, Thomas)
July 14, 2020 Filing 25 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered.ORDER OF REMAND to Middlesex Superior Court. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 14, 2020 Filing 24 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered. Plaintiff's motion to remand the case to state court, [ECF No. #14 ], is GRANTED. The motion to extend time for service, [ECF No. #22 ], is DENIED as moot because the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction in the absence of complete diversity amongst the parties. SO ORDERED.(McDonagh, Christina)
July 1, 2020 Filing 23 Opposition re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 19, 2020 to Serve Defendants with the Amended Complaint and to Allow Federal Service Without Waiving Right to Remand or Violating the Stay filed by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A, Inc. (Schaffer, Michelle)
June 30, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 19, 2020 to Serve Defendants with the Amended Complaint and to Allow Federal Service Without Waiving Right to Remand or Violating the Stay by Adegnaldo Leles DaSilva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service Returns, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Peter Merrigan)(Merrigan, Thomas)
June 29, 2020 Filing 21 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Richard J. Riley and William Reeves Rip Andrews. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
June 29, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard J. Riley and William Reeves "Rip" Andrews Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-8305360 by Adegnaldo Leles DaSilva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Affidavit)(Merrigan, Thomas)
June 22, 2020 Filing 19 Opposition re #14 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and to Lift Stay DEFENDANTS TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC. AND TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO LIFT STAY AND REMAND filed by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A, Inc. (Schaffer, Michelle)
June 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle I. Schaffer on behalf of Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A, Inc (Schaffer, Michelle)
June 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Campbell on behalf of Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A, Inc (Campbell, James)
June 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Adegnaldo Leles DaSilva of His Filing of a Motion to Vacate the Conditional Transfer Order with the JPML (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -- Adegnaldo DaSilva's Motion to Vacate the Conditional Transfer Order that Was Filed with the JPML (with exhibits))(Merrigan, Thomas)
June 18, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and to Lift Stay filed by Adegnaldo Leles DaSilva. (Merrigan, Thomas)
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and to Lift Stay by Adegnaldo Leles DaSilva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Vacating Peterson CTO Due to Remand, #2 Exhibit Order Vacating Ramirez CTO Due to Remand, #3 Exhibit Transfer Order in Lee and Caldwell Cases, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Rip Andrews)(Merrigan, Thomas)
June 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Adegnaldo Leles DaSilva (Amended) of Filing of Opposition to Conditional Transfer Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of AMended Objection to Conditional Transfer Order)(Merrigan, Thomas)
June 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Adegnaldo Leles DaSilva of Filed Opposition to Conditional Transfer Order (Merrigan, Thomas)
May 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas T. Merrigan on behalf of Adegnaldo Leles DaSilva (Merrigan, Thomas)
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A, Inc.(Berard, Matthew)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing, Inc..(Berard, Matthew)
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion to Stay (Folan, Karen)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Weyland, Loren)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A, Inc.(Berard, Matthew)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A, Inc. (Berard, Matthew)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing, Inc.. (Berard, Matthew)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew G. Berard on behalf of Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A, Inc (Berard, Matthew)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A, Inc ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8252417 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Decl of P. Cleary with Exhs A-1 thru A-5, #2 Exhibit B- Complaint, #3 Exhibit C- Decl of H. Clyde with Exhs C-1 thru C-2, #4 Exhibit D- Decl of S. Braga with Exh D-1, #5 Exhibit E- Discovery on Toyota Defs, #6 Exhibit F- Discovery on Boch Defs, #7 Exhibit G- First Amd Complaint, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet & Category Sheet)(Berard, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DaSilva v. Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-40
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew G. Berard
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Michelle I. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boch T, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boch New To You, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A, Inc
Represented By: Matthew G. Berard
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Michelle I. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boch T, Inc. doing business as Boch Toyota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boch New To You, Inc. doing business as Boch New to You Used Car Superstore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adegnaldo Leles DaSilva
Represented By: Peter M. Merrigan
Represented By: William Reeves Andrews
Represented By: Thomas T. Merrigan
Represented By: Richard J. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?