Ericson v. Conagra Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pochanart Ericson and Conagra Brands, Inc.
Defendant: Conagra Foods, Inc. and Full-Fill Industries, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv11022
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(2), 12(b)(6), and 12(f) filed by Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Todd Schlewitt, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Chad Steinbaugh)(Voke, Brian)
July 24, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(2), 12(b)(6), and 12(f) by Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods, Inc..(Voke, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Filing 23 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Emily A. Ambrose. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 16, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Emily A. Ambrose Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8332327 by Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Rule 83.5.3(e)(3) Certification)(Voke, Brian)
June 29, 2020 Filing 21 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Rachael Nevarez. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
June 29, 2020 Filing 20 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Richard J. Leamy Jr.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
June 29, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Rachael Nevarez Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8306599 by Full-Fill Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Meehan, L.)
June 29, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard J. Leamy Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8306569 by Full-Fill Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Meehan, L.)
June 26, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Full-Fill Industries, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Full-Fill Industries, LLC for Full-Fill Industries, LLC.. (Meehan, L.)
June 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by L. Jeffrey Meehan on behalf of Full-Fill Industries, LLC (Meehan, L.)
June 18, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Pochanart Ericson. Full-Fill Industries, LLC served on 6/11/2020, answer due 7/2/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Pochanart Ericson. (Mulvey, Elizabeth)
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Pochanart Ericson. Conagra Foods, Inc. served on 6/3/2020, answer due 7/24/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Pochanart Ericson. (Mulvey, Elizabeth)
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Pochanart Ericson. Conagra Brands, Inc. served on 6/3/2020, answer due 7/24/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Pochanart Ericson. (Mulvey, Elizabeth)
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Conagra Brands, Inc. answer due 7/24/2020; Conagra Foods, Inc. answer due 7/24/2020. (Folan, Karen)
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods, Inc.. (Voke, Brian)
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Voke on behalf of Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods, Inc. (Voke, Brian)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 24, 2020 to File Answer ASSENTED TO MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods, Inc..(Voke, Brian)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Cesarone on behalf of Pochanart Ericson (Cesarone, Frank)
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added J. Craig Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8267706 by Pochanart Ericson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Mulvey, Elizabeth)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Frank V. Cesarone. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8266353 by Pochanart Ericson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mulvey, Elizabeth)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pochanart Ericson Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8261024 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Pochanart Ericson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Mulvey, Elizabeth) (Attachment 1 and Attachment 2 replaced with corrections on 5/29/2020) (Warnock, Douglas). (Attachment 1 replaced with corrected civil cover on 6/1/2020) (Warnock, Douglas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ericson v. Conagra Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pochanart Ericson
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Mulvey
Represented By: J. Craig Smith
Represented By: Frank Cesarone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conagra Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conagra Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Ambrose
Represented By: Brian P. Voke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Full-Fill Industries, LLC
Represented By: Richard J. Leamy, Jr.
Represented By: Rachel S. Nevarez
Represented By: L. Jeffrey Meehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?