MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Ranbaxy Inc et al
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1 LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC and SERIES PMPI
Defendant: Ranbaxy Inc. and Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11023
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: MDL ORDER NO. 1 entered. (Jones, Sherry)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO Number: 1, MDL No. 2878 has been transferred from Northern District of Ohio and assigned civil action number: 20-11023. Northern District of Ohio case number: 20-00982. In Re: Ranbaxy Generic Drug Application Antitrust Litigation, MDL 2878 (Jones, Sherry)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. (Jones, Sherry)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 5:20-cv-00982.
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 1) by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. In Re: MDL 2878 Ranbaxy Generic Drug Application Antitrust Litigation. Case transferred to the District of Massachusetts and assigned to the Honorable Nathaniel M. Gorton. (P,R)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC, SERIES PMPI. (Turner, Tracy)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (B,R)
May 6, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R)
May 6, 2020 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (B,R)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Ranbaxy Inc, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-9962269. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:19-md-2878. Filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, SERIES PMPI, MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - PMPI Assignment, #3 Exhibit B - SummaCare Assignment, #4 Exhibit C - IMC Assignment) (Turner, Tracy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Ranbaxy Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1 LLC
Represented By: Tracy L. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: Tracy L. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERIES PMPI
Represented By: Tracy L. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranbaxy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?