Allen v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
Plaintiff: Meredith Allen
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv11024
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 7/22/2020.1) The Court heard updates on the current total of federal and state filings.2) The Court heard updates on discovery regarding communications between GSK and Novartis and related to recent regulatory actions on Zofran's labeling.3) The Court heard updates on 1594 GSK's renewed motion for summary judgment based on federal preemption. GSK informed the Court that it intends to seek leave to file supplemental briefing in support of its motion.4) A colloquy was held on GSK's pending citizen petition to the FDA.5) A colloquy was held about the pending Daubert motions regarding the parties' general causation experts. 6) A colloquy was held about scheduling a new trial date in the Rodriguez case. The Court advised the parties that due to scheduling difficulties and uncertainties arising out of the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, it would not schedule a new trial date at this time. 7) The Court heard updates on supplemental expert depositions. At the parties' request, the Court postponed the deadline for those depositions to October 15, 2020.8) A colloquy was held on 1947 GSK's Consolidated Motion for Order to Show Cause in Wallace, 20-cv-10441, and Stewart, 19-cv-11411. The Court took the matter under advisement.9) The Court set a status conference for August 18, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. This conference shall be conducted by video conference. The clerk shall post video conference information on the docket via a separate entry. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.) (Attorneys present: Various) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al. (Bono, Christine)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO TELEPHONE PARTICIPANTS: Please use the following Participant line: (877) 876-9177 and Conference ID: ZOFRAN for the Status Conference set for 7/22/2020 at 1:30 PM before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.REMINDER: Counsel and participants who are not addressing the Court, please mute your telephones, so that you may hear the proceeding but other participants will not hear background noise or interference. Please do not put your telephone on hold.Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 6/23/2020.1) The Court heard updates on the current total of federal and state filings.2) The Court heard updates on GSK's citizen petition to the FDA.3) A colloquy was held about scheduling a new trial date in the Rodriguez case. a) The Court advised the parties that due to scheduling difficulties and uncertainties arising out of the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, it would not schedule a new trial date at this time. b) The Court also asked the parties to consider the feasibility of adjustments to ordinary trial practices in order to permit the trial to go forward with fewer participants physically present in the courtroom.4) The Court heard updates on supplemental expert reports and depositions.5) A colloquy was held on 1929 GSK's Consolidated Motion for Order to Show Cause in Driessen, 19-cv- 11783, and Fernandez, 19-cv-11107. The Court took the matter under advisement.6) The Court set a telephonic status conference for July 22, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Various) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO TELEPHONE PARTICIPANTS: Please use the following Participant line: (877) 876-9174 and Conference ID: ZOFRAN for the Status Conference set for 6/23/2020 at 1:30 PM before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.REMINDER: Counsel and participants who are not addressing the Court, please mute your telephones, so that you may hear the proceeding but other participants will not hear background noise or interference. Please do not put your telephone on hold.Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Stevenson on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline, LLC (Stevenson, Jennifer)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; 1:20-cv-11024-FDS Allen v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. In Re: Zofran (Ondansetron) Products Liability Litigation, MDL 2657. (Danieli, Chris)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GlaxoSmithKline, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8261538 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Meredith Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Ayala, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith Allen
Represented By: Thomas V. Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer M. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?