DONAHUE v. JONES & WILSON REALTY LLC et al
Plaintiff: MICAH DONAHUE
Defendant: JONES & WILSON REALTY LLC, SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA and PAT McANIFF PAINTING/ROOF COATINGS
Case Number: 1:2020cv11052
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 16 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by JONES & WILSON REALTY LLC.(Swartz, Jeffery)
July 2, 2020 Filing 15 STATE COURT Record. (Dwyer, Gerald)
July 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald P. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA (Dwyer, Gerald)
June 25, 2020 Filing 13 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by MICAH DONAHUE.(Perry, Timothy)
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 Initial Disclosures of Defendant PAT McANIFF PAINTING/ROOF COATINGS.(McGowan, Owen) Modified docket text on 6/25/2020. (Pacho, Arnold).
June 24, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against PAT McANIFF PAINTING/ROOF COATINGS by JONES & WILSON REALTY LLC.(Swartz, Jeffery)
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Owen P. McGowan on behalf of PAT McANIFF PAINTING/ROOF COATINGS (McGowan, Owen)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by PAT McANIFF PAINTING/ROOF COATINGS.(McGowan, Owen)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Perry, Timothy)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed PAT McANIFF PAINTING/ROOF COATINGS served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Perry, Timothy)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed JONES & WILSON REALTY LLC served on 5/29/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. (Perry, Timothy)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered on pretrial schedule.The Answer having been filed in this personal injury case, the court orders the following pretrial schedule:Initial disclosures required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) must be completed by 7/10/20; Motions for leave to Amend Pleadings & Joinder of Parties due by 9/4/20; Without leave of court, the parties are permitted to serve 30 interrogatories, 30 requests for admissions and 30 document requests, to be filed within the 30 days of the initial disclosures. The court expects responses to be produced in thirty days, unless a showing of inability despite diligent effort is made. A party may not notice more than 5 deponents without leave of court on a showing of good cause. If the parties would like to participate in the court's mediation program, they must notify our docket clerk Arnold Pacho (617-748-9812) no later than 11/25/20, as it may take several weeks to schedule a mediation date.The court notes that, in this session, treating physicians are not required to produce Rule 26 reports, rather plaintiffs relevant medical records are produced as part of fact discovery by plaintiff or by plaintiff's counsel presenting to defendant completed releases for relevant records and providers by 7/10/20 as part of his automatic disclosures. The court does not require treating physicians to produce reports under Rule 26 if producing his or her relevant treatment records. Plaintiff is obligated to supplement these records under the procedural rules.All fact discovery must be completed by 1/22/21. While rare in a personal injury case, any dispositive motions are due by 2/19/21; Oppositions by 3/12/21; Reply only with leave of court. If the parties intend to engage to expert witness(es) (other than treating physicians), they must inform the court no later than 12/30/20, so that the pretrial schedule can be amended.(Zierk, Marsha) Modified on 6/23/2020 to correct date (to 2021) for fact discovery and dispositive motions (Pacho, Arnold).
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA.(Dwyer, Gerald)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email.(Burgos, Sandra)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8268661 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Complaint))(Dwyer, Gerald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DONAHUE v. JONES & WILSON REALTY LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONES & WILSON REALTY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Gerald P. Dwyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAT McANIFF PAINTING/ROOF COATINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICAH DONAHUE
Represented By: Timothy J. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?