Schnitzer v. Evenflo Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Schnitzer
Defendant: Evenflo Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11063
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 22 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Motion for appointment of lead counsel and/or proposed further initial case management orders as to "All Actions" shall be filed by July 9, 2020.Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02938-DJC et al.(Hourihan, Lisa)
June 9, 2020 Filing 21 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 1 Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02938-DJC et al.(Hourihan, Lisa)
June 5, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO, MDL No. 2938 has been transferred from Eastern District of New York and assigned civil action number: 20-11063. Eastern District of New York case number: 20-01000. (Jones, Sherry)
June 4, 2020 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. (Jones, Sherry)
June 4, 2020 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01000.
June 3, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order MDL No. 2938 IN RE: EVENFLO COMPANY, INC., MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the District of Massachusetts are transferred to the District of Massachusetts, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Denise J. Casper for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Ortiz, Grisel)
June 3, 2020 Case electronically transferred to the District of Massachusetts. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Ortiz, Grisel)
June 2, 2020 Filing 16 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order MDL No. 2938 IN RE: EVENFLO COMPANY, INC., MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the District of Massachusetts are transferred to the District of Massachusetts, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Denise J. Casper for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court of the District of Massachusetts (Ortiz, Grisel)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting #15 Motion to extend stay. All proceedings and deadlines in this matter are stayed until the earlier of (1) a decision by the JPMDL, or (2) 7/15/20. To the extent either party seeks a further extension of this stay, such an application may be made by letter motion to be submitted prior to the expiration of the term of this stay as set forth above. The conference scheduled for 6/24/20 is adjourned to 7/30/20 at 11:15 a.m. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 5/27/2020. (Disbrow, Sandra)
May 26, 2020 Filing 15 Letter MOTION to Stay all Deadlines by Evenflo Company, Inc.. (Scarborough, Lawrence)
May 4, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING SESSION: Pursuant to the order of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed today, notice is hereby given that a hearing session has been scheduled to consider various matters under 28 U.S.C. 1407. DATE OF HEARING SESSION: May 28, 2020. LOCATION OF HEARING SESSION: United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Thurgood Marshall Federal Judiciary Building, One Columbus Circle, NE, Washington, DC 20544-0005. TIME OF HEARING SESSION: 9:30 a.m. SCHEDULED MATTERS: Matters scheduled for consideration at this hearing session are listed on the enclosed Hearing Session Order and Schedule of Matters for Hearing Session. Section A of this Schedule lists the matters designated for oral argument by videoconference or teleconference and includes all actions encompassed by Motion(s) for transfer filed pursuant to Rules 6.1 and 6.2. Any party waiving oral argument pursuant to Rule 11.1(d) need not participate in the Hearing Session videoconference or teleconference.Section B of this Schedule lists the matters that the Panel has determined to consider without oral argument, pursuant to Rule 11.1(c). Parties and counsel involved in these matters need not participate in the Hearing Session. (Florio, Lisa)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Johnathan B. Cohen is permitted to argue or try this case, in whole or in part, as counsel for Plaintiff. The attorney shall register for ECF; registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of all activity in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 4/27/2020. (Minerva, Deanna)
April 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan B. Cohen Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12716568. by David Schnitzer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan B. Cohen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Jonathan B. Cohen) (Cohen, Jonathan)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting #11 Motion to Stay. In light of the motion to transfer and consolidate pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 before the Joint Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPMDL"), and upon a finding that good cause exists, the Court grants the request for a stay in this case pending the JPMDL's decision on the transfer motion. Accordingly, all proceedings and deadlines in this matter are stayed until the earlier of (1) a decision by the JPMDL, or (2) 6/1/20. To the extent either party seeks a further extension of this stay, such an application may be made by letter motion, not to exceed three (3) pages, and shall be submitted prior to the expiration of the term of this stay as set forth above. The conference scheduled for 6/24/20 at 11:15 a.m. remains on the calendar as a control date. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 3/19/2020. (Disbrow, Sandra)
March 18, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Evenflo Company, Inc. (Scarborough, Lawrence)
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay (Unopposed) All Proceedings Pending Transfer and Consolidation by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Evenflo Company, Inc.. (Scarborough, Lawrence)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence G Scarborough on behalf of Evenflo Company, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Scarborough, Lawrence)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Gregory F. Coleman is permitted to argue or try this case, in whole or in part, as counsel for Plaintiff David Schnitzer. The attorney shall register for ECF; registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of all activity in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 3/12/2020. (Minerva, Deanna)
March 11, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory F. Coleman Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12522049. by David Schnitzer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel PHV for Gregory F. Coleman, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Gregory F. Coleman) (Coleman, Gregory)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Jonathan B. Cohen is permitted to argue or try this case, in whole or in part, as counsel for Plaintiff. The attorney shall register for ECF; registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of all activity in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 3/11/2020. (Minerva, Deanna)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan B. Cohen Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12515668. by David Schnitzer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan Cohen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Jonathan Cohen) (Cohen, Jonathan)
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 Copy of Motion of Plaintiff Najah Rose to Transfer Actions to the Eastern District of WisconsinPursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings, Brief in Support of Motion of Plaintiff Najah Rose to Transfer Actions to the Eastern District of Wisconsin Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings. Filed in the JPMDL. (Marziliano, August)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Schnitzer. Evenflo Company, Inc. served on 2/27/2020, answer due 3/19/2020. (Straus, Alex)
February 27, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 6/24/2020 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF. (Disbrow, Sandra)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Evenflo Company, Inc.. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 26, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by David Schnitzer (Straus, Alex)
February 25, 2020 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet; specifically Page 2 of the Civil Cover Sheet is missing. Please resubmit a corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Evenflo Company, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12436590. Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes, filed by David Schnitzer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Action Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Straus, Alex) Modified on 2/26/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schnitzer v. Evenflo Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Schnitzer
Represented By: Alex Rafael Straus
Represented By: Jonathan Cohen
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evenflo Company, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence G. Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?