Ramasamy v. Evenflo Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: SUDHAKAR RAMASAMY
Defendant: Evenflo Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11071
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 20 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Motion for appointment of lead counsel and/or proposed further initial case management orders as to "All Actions" shall be filed by July 9, 2020.Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02938-DJC et al.(Hourihan, Lisa)
June 9, 2020 Filing 19 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MDL Order No. 1 Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02938-DJC et al.(Hourihan, Lisa)
June 5, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO, MDL No. 2938 has been transferred from Eastern District of North Carolina and assigned civil action number: 20-11071. Eastern District of North Carolina case number: 20-00068. (Jones, Sherry)
June 5, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. (Jones, Sherry)
June 5, 2020 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:20-cv-00068.
June 3, 2020 Filing 15 TRANSFER ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the District of Massachusetts are transferred to the District of Massachusetts, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Denise J. Casper for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair, Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Stouch, L.)
May 28, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Gregory F. Coleman on behalf of Sudhakar Ramasamy. (Coleman, Gregory)
April 24, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Gregory F. Coleman on behalf of Sudhakar Ramasamy. (Coleman, Gregory)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay. All case deadlines are STAYED pending the JPML's final decision on whether this action will be transferred to the MDL. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/23/2020. (Stouch, L.)
March 19, 2020 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #9 Consent MOTION to Stay. (Stouch, L.)
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Evenflo Company, Inc. (Sidbury, Benjamin)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support regarding #9 Consent MOTION to Stay filed by Evenflo Company, Inc.. (Sidbury, Benjamin)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION to Stay filed by Evenflo Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sidbury, Benjamin)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Benjamin Freedman Sidbury on behalf of Evenflo Company, Inc.. (Sidbury, Benjamin)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service for Summons, Complaint filed by Sudhakar Ramasamy served on Evenflo Company, Inc. on February 27, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Geer, Martha)
March 6, 2020 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel K. Bryson on behalf of Sudhakar Ramasamy. (Bryson, Daniel)
March 5, 2020 Second Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). Daniel K. Bryson should file his Notice of Appearance in the case. (Stouch, L.)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick M. Wallace on behalf of Sudhakar Ramasamy. (Wallace, Patrick)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Martha A. Geer on behalf of Sudhakar Ramasamy. (Geer, Martha)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Evenflo Company, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
February 25, 2020 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by SUDHAKAR RAMASAMY (Bryson, Daniel)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EVENFLO COMPANY, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5328523.), filed by SUDHAKAR RAMASAMY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Bryson, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramasamy v. Evenflo Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUDHAKAR RAMASAMY
Represented By: Patrick M. Wallace
Represented By: Martha A. Geer
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evenflo Company, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Freedman Sidbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?