Hebert v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Hebert
Defendant: Ethicon Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv11077
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 53 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DEF Collective Exhibit, #2 Exhibit B - DEF Bourque Order, #3 Exhibit C - PLTF - PT Order 303, #4 Exhibit D - PLTF - 5.22.20 Transfer Order, #5 Exhibit E - PLTF - Collective orders, #6 Exhibit F - PLTF - Witness List)(Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
July 7, 2020 Filing 52 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #51 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Elia A. Robertson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Currie, Haley)
June 23, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Elia A. Robertson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8297646 by Patricia Hebert. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Harris, Michael)
June 23, 2020 Filing 50 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. In light of the transfer of this matter to this Court, counsel for the parties shall confer regarding the topics identified under Local Rule 16.5(d) and file a joint pretrial memorandum, not to exceed 20 pages that provides the topics identified under Local Rule 16.5(d), propose deadlines for the filing of motions in limine, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, a proposed trial date, a proposed date for the final pretrial conference and gives the parties' estimated length of trial. Pretrial memorandum to be filed by 7/14/20.(Hourihan, Lisa)
June 12, 2020 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
June 12, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M. Guilfoyle on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
June 12, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Campbell on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Campbell, James)
June 5, 2020 Filing 46 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Danieli, Chris)
June 5, 2020 Filing 45 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:16-cv-08011.
June 1, 2020 Filing 44 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #32 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1986) Pls Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1988) Pls Mem in Support of Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2143) Defs Resp to Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3844) Pls Reply to Notice of Adoption of Prior Response of Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6864) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6973) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7119) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr.)(Gage, William)
June 1, 2020 Filing 43 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #32 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6860) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6965) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (7143) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William)
June 1, 2020 Filing 42 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #32 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2425) Pls Mot to Exclude Peter L. Rosenblatt, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2428) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peter L. Rosenblatt, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2535) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Peter L. Rosenblatt, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2625) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Peter L. Rosenblatt, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6843) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Peter L. Rosenblatt, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6980) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Peter L. Rosenblatt, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7107) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Peter L. Rosenblatt)(Gage, William)
June 1, 2020 Filing 41 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #32 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (6824) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (6998) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (7100) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean)(Gage, William)
June 1, 2020 Filing 40 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #32 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (6892) Pls Mot to Exclude Oz Harmanli, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (6895) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Oz Harmanli, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (6996) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Oz Harmanli, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (7182) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Oz Harmanli)(Gage, William)
June 1, 2020 Filing 39 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #32 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2115) - Defs Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2116) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2201) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2264) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6846) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6963) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7152) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Defs Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon)(Gage, William)
June 1, 2020 Filing 38 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #32 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2075) - Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2078) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2172) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2214) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2759) - Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6821) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6958) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (7177) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence)(Gage, William)
June 1, 2020 Filing 37 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #32 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2200) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) - Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 5 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 6 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (6648) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (6833) Amended Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (6926) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (7123) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William)
June 1, 2020 Filing 36 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #32 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1978) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 3- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 4- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 5- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 6- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 7- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 8- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 9- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 10- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 11- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 12- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 13- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 14- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 15- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 16- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 17- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 18- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 19- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 20- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 21- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (1982) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 4 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William)
June 1, 2020 Filing 35 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #32 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3621) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3865) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 3- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6875) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (7038) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (7045) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (7085) Amended Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (7183) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William)
June 1, 2020 Filing 34 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #32 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2066) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 3- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 4- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 5- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 6- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2070) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 4 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 5 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 6 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 7 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 8 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 9 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 10 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 11 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 12 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 13 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 14 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 15 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2251) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William)
June 1, 2020 Filing 33 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #32 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2082) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2082) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2082) Part 3- Defs Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2085) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2191) Pls Amended Resp to Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2215) Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2815) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2952) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (5339) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (5339) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (5340) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (5491) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (6842) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot and Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (6922) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Daniel Elliott)(Gage, William)
June 1, 2020 Filing 32 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 06/05/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 06/04/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/22/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw)
April 24, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 - Letter)(Gage, William)
April 23, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Patricia Hebert (Balefsky, Lee)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (sak) (ADI)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI)
October 31, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #24 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Merk, Melissa)
October 23, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE by Patricia Hebert in opposition to #22 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Balefsky, Lee)
October 17, 2018 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #22 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Merk, Melissa)
October 17, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Merk, Melissa)
October 2, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Norman Hebert on October 3, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Merk, Melissa)
October 2, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Michael Hebert on October 3, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Merk, Melissa)
October 2, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Julie-Ann Witham on October 3, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Merk, Melissa)
August 22, 2018 Filing 18 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for John Bresette, MD. (Merk, Melissa)
August 16, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Molly E. Flynn on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Flynn, Molly)
August 16, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of John Bresette, M.D. on September 5, 2018 at 9:00 AM (Merk, Melissa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Testimony Disclosures. (Gage, William)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER The #12 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or Alternatively for Plaintiffs to Show Cause for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or for Alternative Relief, Request for Expedited Briefing is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/14/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: Cases Listed on Appendix A & B) (mek)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (kp) (ADI)
June 13, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or Alternatively for Plaintiffs to Show Cause for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or for Alternative Relief, Request for Expedited Briefing and Supporting Memorandum (Gage, William)
May 21, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admissions and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Merk, Melissa)
May 10, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christian Elizabeth Piccolo on behalf of Ethicon, Inc. (Piccolo, Christian)
May 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Patricia Hebert on May 14, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Merk, Melissa)
March 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of #6 Notice of Videotaped Deposition (Gage, William)
January 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Byungyol Chun on 4/23/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Combs, Philip)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mek) (ADI)
June 6, 2017 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Patricia Hebert. (Jimenez, Priscilla)
September 27, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy)
September 13, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David)
August 24, 2016 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 235 (Order Scheduling Status Conference and Meetings in MDLs on September 13-14, 2016) entered on 07/20/2016 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (jk)
August 23, 2016 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-4817487. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hebert v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Hebert
Represented By: Lee B Balefsky
Represented By: Priscilla E. Jimenez
Represented By: Elia A. Robertson
Represented By: Michael J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A. Merk
Represented By: Molly E. Flynn
Represented By: Christian Elizabeth Piccolo
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Kathleen M. Guilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Melissa A. Merk
Represented By: Molly E. Flynn
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Kathleen M. Guilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?