McDermet v. INDRA ENERGY et al
Plaintiff: William McDermet
Defendant: Palmco Power MA, LLC, PALMCO POWER PA, LLC, Robert Palmese, INDRA ENERGY and PALMCO ENERGY PA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv11107
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Marianne B Bowler
Referring Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. In light of the reassignment of the case to Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, the parties are advised that the Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler on August 24, 2020 at 2:15 p.m. is canceled. (Belpedio, Lisa)
August 7, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 8/24/2020 at 2:10 PM before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Please note slight time change.) This hearing shall be conducted remotely, by telephone only. Counsel of record will receive dial-in instructions at the email registered in CM/ECF. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public by way of teleconference. In order to gain access to the hearing via teleconference you must sign up at the following address: www.public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact www.media@uscourts.gov. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Order Template)(Bono, Christine)
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris)
August 5, 2020 Filing 15 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (DiCairano, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 8/24/2020 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold)
July 28, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by William McDermet ONLY. (McDermet, William). Consent is still pending. Modified on 8/3/2020 (Putnam, Harold).
July 26, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Putnam, Harold)
July 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Bowler, Marianne)
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Todd P. Stelter Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8340351 by INDRA ENERGY, PALMCO ENERGY PA, LLC, PALMCO POWER PA, LLC, Palmco Power MA, LLC, Robert Palmese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(DiCairano, Steven)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss, and/or Motion for More Definite Statement filed by William McDermet. (McDermet, William)
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss, and/or Motion for More Definite Statement filed by INDRA ENERGY, PALMCO ENERGY PA, LLC, PALMCO POWER PA, LLC, Palmco Power MA, LLC, Robert Palmese. (DiCairano, Steven)
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss, and/or Motion for More Definite Statement by INDRA ENERGY, PALMCO ENERGY PA, LLC, PALMCO POWER PA, LLC, Palmco Power MA, LLC, Robert Palmese. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DiCairano, Steven)
July 1, 2020 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. (Bowler, Marianne)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 8, 2020 to Respond to the Complaint by INDRA ENERGY, PALMCO ENERGY PA, LLC, PALMCO POWER PA, LLC, Palmco Power MA, LLC, Robert Palmese.(DiCairano, Steven)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 STATE COURT Record. (DiCairano, Steven)
June 21, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2020 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. Please call 888-675-2535 approximately five minutes prior to the conference, using Access Code 6641794. (Putnam, Harold)
June 17, 2020 Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. (Bowler, Marianne)
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 1, 2020 to Respond to the Amended Complaint by INDRA ENERGY, PALMCO ENERGY PA, LLC, PALMCO POWER PA, LLC, Palmco Power MA, LLC, Robert Palmese.(DiCairano, Steven)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Jones, Sherry)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by INDRA ENERGY, PALMCO ENERGY PA, LLC, PALMCO POWER PA, LLC, Palmco Power MA, LLC, Robert Palmese ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8278983 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Indra Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Palmese Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Palmco Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Category Form)(DiCairano, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDermet v. INDRA ENERGY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palmco Power MA, LLC
Represented By: Steven E. DiCairano
Represented By: Todd P. Stelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PALMCO POWER PA, LLC
Represented By: Steven E. DiCairano
Represented By: Todd P. Stelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Palmese
Represented By: Steven E. DiCairano
Represented By: Todd P. Stelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDRA ENERGY
Represented By: Steven E. DiCairano
Represented By: Todd P. Stelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PALMCO ENERGY PA, LLC
Represented By: Steven E. DiCairano
Represented By: Todd P. Stelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McDermet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?