Fernandez Jimenez v. Gertz
Plaintiff: Laura Fernandez Jimenez
Defendant: William J. Gertz
Case Number: 1:2020cv11110
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT Record William J. Gertz summons served on 6/5/2020, answer due 6/26/2020.. (Curran, Patrick)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Laura Fernandez Jimenez by William J. Gertz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Counterclaim)(Curran, Patrick)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal, REVISED C.A. COVER SHEET with Attorney Signature and date by William J. Gertz. (Curran, Patrick)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Rosenberg on behalf of Laura Fernandez Jimenez (Rosenberg, Nicholas)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Weyland, Loren)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by William J. Gertz ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8279388 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit A - E, #4 Affidavit Jean M. Quinn)(Curran, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez Jimenez v. Gertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Fernandez Jimenez
Represented By: Nicholas J. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Gertz
Represented By: Patrick M. Curran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?