Stylianos et al v. US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff: Thomas Stylianos Jr. and Daniel Dem
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv11127
Filed: June 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by US Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Johnson, Anita)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by US Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Johnson, Anita)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #6 . The Defendant requests a 60-day extension of time to respond in part because Defendant "is attempting to locate the files requested and to consider whether, considering they relate to another individual, they are releasable to Plaintiff." The court finds no cause for the requested extension where this inquiry should have occurred prior to the denial of Plaintiff's administrative appeal. As a courtesy, the court extends the Defendant's time to respond to the complaint to July 31, 2020. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/16/2020 to File Answer partially by US Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Johnson, Anita)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Thomas Stylianos Jr., Daniel Dem. All Defendants. Acknowledgement filed by Thomas Stylianos Jr., Daniel Dem. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service Proof)(Stylianos, Thomas)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Johnson on behalf of US Citizenship and Immigration Services (Johnson, Anita)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to US Citizenship and Immigration Services. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
June 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Injunctive (FOIA) Relief against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8284142 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Thomas, Jr. Stylianos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit)(Stylianos, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stylianos et al v. US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Anita Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Stylianos Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Stylianos, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Dem
Represented By: Thomas Stylianos, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?