Correa Talutto et al v. Evenflo Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Debora De Souza Correa Talutto and Karyn Aly
Defendant: Evenflo Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11175
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Denise J Casper
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1711
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 18 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Motion for appointment of lead counsel and/or proposed further initial case management orders as to "All Actions" shall be filed by July 9, 2020.(Jones, Sherry)
June 19, 2020 Filing 17 Judge Denise J. Casper: MDL ORDER NO. 1 entered. (Jones, Sherry)
June 19, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: Pursuant to CTO Number: 1, MDL No. 2938 has been transferred from Middle District of Florida and assigned civil action number: 20-11175. Middle District of Florida case number: 20-00437. In Re: Evenflo Company, Inc., Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation, MDL 2938 (Jones, Sherry)
June 19, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. (Jones, Sherry)
June 19, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 6:20-cv-00437.
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: District of Massachusetts. MDL case number: 2938 (MAA)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: District of Massachusetts. MDL case number: 2938 (MAA)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Judge Kelly's Standing Order on Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 5/13/2020. (HMK)
April 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of change of address by George Franjola (Franjola, George)
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Evenflo Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Goodbaby US Holdings, Inc. for Evenflo Co., Inc... (Axelman, David)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay pending the decision of the JPML regarding transfer, the hearing on which is scheduled May 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/27/2020. (LAM)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending the JPML's Decision to Transfer by Karyn Aly, Debora De Souza Correa Talutto. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Neary, Robert)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER of service returned executed on 03/16/2020 by Debora De Souza Correa Talutto, Karyn Aly as to Evenflo Co., Inc.. (Neary, Robert)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/27/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/13/2020. (LAM)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 (CLASS ACTION). Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/27/2020. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/13/2020. (LAM)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Evenflo Co., Inc. (MEJ)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:20-cv-437-Orl-31GJK. (SJB)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Class Action against Evenflo Co., Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16577151) filed by Debora De Souza Correa Talutto, Karyn Aly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Evenflo Co., Inc.)(Neary, Robert) Modified on 3/12/2020 (MEJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Correa Talutto et al v. Evenflo Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debora De Souza Correa Talutto
Represented By: Robert J. Neary
Represented By: George Franjola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karyn Aly
Represented By: Robert J. Neary
Represented By: George Franjola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evenflo Co., Inc.
Represented By: David Axelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?