United States of America v. Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11217
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Referring Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Dismiss by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Scheff, Richard)
July 7, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey Ross on behalf of United States of America (Ross, Lindsey)
July 1, 2020 Filing 16 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Samantha Barrett Badlam,. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Carrie Sarhangi Love. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor)
June 30, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Lazarus on behalf of United States of America (Lazarus, David)
June 26, 2020 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Carrie Sarhangi Love Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8305082 by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Carrie Sarhangi Love)(Scheff, Richard)
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Samantha B. Badlam Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8304755 by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(O'Connor, Brien)
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Brien T. O'Connor on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (O'Connor, Brien)
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Scheff on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Scheff, Richard)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV added. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.I hereby RECUSE from this case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 455(a). The Clerk shall randomly reassign this matter to another district judge.(Montes, Mariliz)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 6/25/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Panich, Evan)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 Set Deadlines: Service to be completed by 9/22/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin added. Judge Denise J. Casper no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Hourihan, Lisa)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan D. Panich on behalf of United States of America (Panich, Evan)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Fee Status: US Government), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37)(Shapiro, Gregg) (Attachment 27 replaced on 6/30/2020) (Halley, Taylor). (Attachment 29 replaced on 6/30/2020) (Halley, Taylor). (Attachment 27 replaced on 6/30/2020) (Halley, Taylor).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Scheff
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Represented By: Carrie Sarhangi Love
Represented By: Samantha Barrett Badlam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gregg D. Shapiro
Represented By: Evan D. Panich
Represented By: Lindsey Ross
Represented By: David G. Lazarus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?