Onyx Enterprises Int'l Corp. v. ID Parts LLC
Plaintiff: Onyx Enterprises Int'l Corp.
Defendant: ID Parts LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv11253
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Onyx Enterprises Int'l Corp. by ID Parts LLC.(Strand, John)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ID Parts LLC, filed by Onyx Enterprises Int'l Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ID Trademark Registration, #2 Exhibit Trademark Applications and Registrations, #3 Exhibit USPTO non-final Office Action, #4 Exhibit Onyx Website, #5 Exhibit ID Parts Website, #6 Exhibit ID Parts Website Thumbnail, #7 Exhibit ID Parts Facebook, Instagram, and Twitter, #8 Exhibit Notice to ID Parts, #9 Exhibit Email Reply to Notice, #10 Exhibit Cease and Desist)(Brewer, Nina)
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, ID Parts LLC answer due 8/21/2020. (Urso, Lisa)
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ID Parts LLC. (Strand, John)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 21, 2020 to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by ID Parts LLC.(Strand, John)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mishele Kieffer. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Currie, Haley)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Aaron P. Bradford. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Currie, Haley)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Onyx Enterprises Int'l Corp.. ID Parts LLC served on 7/10/2020, answer due 7/31/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Onyx Enterprises Int'l Corp.. (Brewer, Nina)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mishele Kieffer Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8320002 by Onyx Enterprises Int'l Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Nina Brewer in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, #2 Affidavit Certification of Mishele Kieffer in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, #3 Certification of Service, #4 Order Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Brewer, Nina)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Aaron Bradford Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8319905 by Onyx Enterprises Int'l Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Nina Brewer in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, #2 Affidavit Certification of Aaron Bradford in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Brewer, Nina)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Onyx Enterprises Int'l Corp.. (Brewer, Nina)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Brewer, Nina)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ID Parts LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ID Parts LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8308827 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Onyx Enterprises Int'l Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cease and Desist, #2 Exhibit Response to Cease and Desist, #3 Exhibit Follow up to Cease and Desist Response, #4 Exhibit Bradford Declaration, #5 Exhibit Onyx Marks, #6 Exhibit USPTO Office Action, #7 Exhibit StreetID Platform, #8 Exhibit ID Parts, #9 Exhibit ID Parts.com, #10 Exhibit Facebook and Twitter, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons)(Brewer, Nina) (#13 Category Sheet added on 7/2/2020 for lack of original filing)(Currie, Haley).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onyx Enterprises Int'l Corp. v. ID Parts LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ID Parts LLC
Represented By: John L. Strand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onyx Enterprises Int'l Corp.
Represented By: Aaron P Bradford
Represented By: Nina Prevot Brewer
Represented By: Mishele Kieffer
Represented By: Aaron P. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?