President and Fellows of Harvard College et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al Featured Case

A lawsuit filed by Harvard University and the Massachusetts Institute of Technology against the Trump administration over the Administration's move to strip international students of their visas if coursework at their respective universities and colleges are entirely online when classes resume in the fall of 2020.

Plaintiff: President and Fellows of Harvard College and Massachusetts Institute of Technology
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, Matthew Albence, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 1:2020cv11283
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 25 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Status Conference held on 7/10/2020. Colloquy re: schedule. Defendant will file response by 12:00 p.m. on 7/13/20, Plaintiff will file reply by 12:00 p.m. on 7/14/20. Amicus Briefs to be filed by 12:00 p.m. on 7/13/20 and will be limited to 15 pages. Hearing set for 7/14/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Holtzblatt, Waxman, Wolfson, Ellsworth, Lee, Fleming, Farquhar) (Folan, Karen)
July 9, 2020 Filing 24 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Status Conference held on 7/9/2020. Colloquy re: TRO and response time for govt. Hearing will reconvene tomorrow. Status Conference set for 7/10/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Lee, Ellsworth, Fleming, Waxman, Wolfson, Holtzblatt, Farqhar) (Folan, Karen)
July 9, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Rayford A. Farquhar on behalf of Matthew Albence, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf (Farquhar, Rayford)
July 9, 2020 Filing 22 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ari Holtzblatt. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 9, 2020 Filing 21 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Paul R.Q. Wolfson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 9, 2020 Filing 20 Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Seth P. Waxman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5.3, local counsel shall also file an appearance in this matter. Further, local counsel shall review all filings and shall personally appear in Court for any hearings or conferences, unless expressly excused by the Court for good cause. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 8, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ari Holtzblatt Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8320311 by Massachusetts Institute of Technology, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Ari Holtzblatt in Support)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 8, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Paul R.Q. Wolfson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8320310 by Massachusetts Institute of Technology, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Paul R.Q. Wolfson in Support)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 8, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Seth P. Waxman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8320307 by Massachusetts Institute of Technology, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Seth P. Waxman in Support)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 8, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark C. Fleming on behalf of Massachusetts Institute of Technology, President and Fellows of Harvard College (Fleming, Mark)
July 8, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Lee on behalf of Massachusetts Institute of Technology, President and Fellows of Harvard College (Lee, William)
July 8, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. A status conference has been scheduled for July 9, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs shall serve Defendants, who have not yet entered an appearance, with a copy of this Order.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Folan, Karen)
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs added. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
July 8, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sec. 455(a), I hereby recuse myself in this matter and direct the Clerk to reassign the case forthwith. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Matthew Albence, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION re 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Declaration of Cynthia Barnhart) by Massachusetts Institute of Technology, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION re 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Declaration of Mark C. Elliott) by Massachusetts Institute of Technology, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION re 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Declaration of Alan M. Garber) by Massachusetts Institute of Technology, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION re 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Declaration of Felicia Ellsworth) by Massachusetts Institute of Technology, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Massachusetts Institute of Technology, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Massachusetts Institute of Technology, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Massachusetts Institute of Technology identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent for Massachusetts Institute of Technology.. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by President and Fellows of Harvard College identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent for President and Fellows of Harvard College.. (Ellsworth, Felicia)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, against Matthew Albence, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad F. Wolf Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8318131 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Massachusetts Institute of Technology, President and Fellows of Harvard College. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Civil Category Sheet, # 4 Summons - DHS, # 5 Summons - ICE, # 6 Summons - Wolf, # 7 Summons - Albence)(Ellsworth, Felicia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: President and Fellows of Harvard College et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: President and Fellows of Harvard College
Represented By: William F. Lee
Represented By: Mark C. Fleming
Represented By: Felicia H. Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Institute of Technology
Represented By: William F. Lee
Represented By: Mark C. Fleming
Represented By: Felicia H. Ellsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?