Argov v. Simon & Schuster, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sherry Argov
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Simon & Schuster Digital Sales Inc., Adams Media, Simon & Schuster, Inc., Proquest LLC, EBSCO Information Services and EBSCO Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11284
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: George A OToole
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 13 Set/Reset Deadlines as to EBSCO Information Services, EBSCO Industries, Inc. Responses due by 9/25/2020 (Lyness, Paul)
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time (Lyness, Paul)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 25, 2020 to Respond To First Amended Complaint by EBSCO Industries, Inc., EBSCO Information Services.(Thorvaldsen, Kara)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 Amended Complaint Adams Media answer due 9/16/2020; Simon & Schuster Digital Sales Inc. answer due 9/16/2020; Simon & Schuster, Inc. answer due 9/16/2020. (Lyness, Paul)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to September 16, 2020 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint by Adams Media, Simon & Schuster Digital Sales Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc..(Brown, Vanessa) (Modified on 8/17/2020 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event.)(Paine, Matthew).
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Albano on behalf of Adams Media, Simon & Schuster Digital Sales Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc. (Albano, Jonathan)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa M. Brown on behalf of Adams Media, Simon & Schuster Digital Sales Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc. (Brown, Vanessa)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to EBSCO Industries, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sherry Argov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Colbert, Edward)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Paine, Matthew)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Adams Media, DOES 1-10, Proquest LLC, Simon & Schuster Digital Sales Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8319561 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Sherry Argov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form, #5 AO 121)(Colbert, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argov v. Simon & Schuster, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon & Schuster Digital Sales Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Albano
Represented By: Vanessa M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams Media
Represented By: Jonathan M. Albano
Represented By: Vanessa M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan M. Albano
Represented By: Vanessa M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proquest LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBSCO Information Services
Represented By: Kara G. Thorvaldsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBSCO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Kara G. Thorvaldsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Argov
Represented By: Edward V. Colbert, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?