Commonwealth of Massachusetts et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota, State of Maryland, State of Connecticut, State of New Mexico, State of Delaware, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, State of Vermont, State of Nevada, State of Oregon, Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Colorado, State of Illinois, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of Wisconsin, District of Columbia, State of Michigan, State of Rhode Island and State of New Jersey
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Matthew T. Albence, Chad F. Wolf and United States Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv11311
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Allison D Burroughs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Wisconsin. (Taylor, Abigail)
July 14, 2020 Filing 13 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Allison D. Burroughs: Telephone Conference held on 7/14/2020. Finding as moot #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs. Plaintiffs to file a status report in a week.Status Report due by 7/21/2020. (Court Reporter: Joan Daly at joanmdaly62@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Taylor, Farquhar) (Folan, Karen)
July 14, 2020 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 7/14/2020 03:45 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Allison D. Burroughs. (Folan, Karen)
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Abrisham Eshghi on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Eshghi, Abrisham)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine B. Dirks on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Dirks, Katherine)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Taylor on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Taylor, Abigail)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie E. Green on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Green, Julie)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Haile on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Haile, Andrew)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth N. Dewar on behalf of Commonwealth of Massachusetts (Dewar, Elizabeth)
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decl. Connecticut State Colleges and Universities, #2 Exhibit Decl. University of Connecticut, #3 Exhibit Decl. Yale University, #4 Exhibit Decl. Chicago State University, #5 Exhibit Decl. Depaul University, #6 Exhibit Decl. Eastern Illinois University, #7 Exhibit Decl. Governors State University, #8 Exhibit Decl. Illinois State University, #9 Exhibit Decl. Loyola University of Chicago, #10 Exhibit Decl. Northeastern Illinois University, #11 Exhibit Decl. Northern Illinois University, #12 Exhibit Decl. Northwestern University, #13 Exhibit Decl. School of the Art Institute of Chicago, #14 Exhibit Decl. Southern Illinois University Carbondale, #15 Exhibit Decl. Southern Illinois University Edwardsville, #16 Exhibit Decl. University of Chicago, #17 Exhibit Decl. University of Illinois System, #18 Exhibit Decl. Western Illinois University, #19 Exhibit Decl. University System of Maryland, #20 Exhibit Decl. Association of Independent Colleges & Universities in Massachusetts, #21 Exhibit Decl. Boston University, #22 Exhibit Decl. Greater Boston Chamber of Commerce, #23 Exhibit Decl. Massachusetts Association of Community Colleges, #24 Exhibit Decl. Massachusetts State Universities, #25 Exhibit Decl. Northeastern University, #26 Exhibit Decl. University of Massachusetts, #27 Exhibit Decl. Minnesota State Colleges and Universities, #28 Exhibit Decl. New Mexico Institute of Mining and Technology, #29 Exhibit Decl. State of Oregon Higher Education Coordinating Commission, #30 Exhibit Decl. Rutgers University, #31 Exhibit Decl. Tufts University, #32 Exhibit Decl. University of Wisconsin Stevens Point, #33 Exhibit Decl. University of Wisconsin Stout, #34 Exhibit Decl. University of Wisconsin Milwaukee, #35 Exhibit Decl. Columbia College Chicago, #36 Exhibit Decl. University of Vermont and State Agricultural College, #37 Exhibit Decl. University of Wisconsin Madison, #38 Exhibit Decl. Rochelle Walensky, M.D., Mph, #39 Exhibit Decl. University of the District of Columbia, #40 Exhibit Decl. Virginia Polytechnic Institute)(Taylor, Abigail)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Declarations)(Taylor, Abigail)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Massachusetts et al. against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8324969 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Commonwealth of Virginia, District of Columbia, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nevada, State of New Jersey, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, Abigail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commonwealth of Massachusetts et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Maryland
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By: Andrew J. Haile
Represented By: Katherine B. Dirks
Represented By: Abrisham Eshghi
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Dewar
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Represented By: Julie E. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nevada
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oregon
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District of Columbia
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Michigan
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Jersey
Represented By: Abigail Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew T. Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?