Jiajing (Beijing) Tourism Co. Ltd. v. AEROBALLOON USA, INC.
Plaintiff: Jiajing (Beijing) Tourism Co. Ltd.
Defendant: AEROBALLOON USA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11313
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 27:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by George W Skogstrom, Jr on behalf of AEROBALLOON USA, INC. (Skogstrom, George)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 Objection and ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by AEROBALLOON USA, INC..(Cairns, Shatilla Shera)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shatilla Shera B. Cairns on behalf of AEROBALLOON USA, INC. (Cairns, Shatilla Shera)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed All Defendants. (Redlich, Marc)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Set Deadlines: Complete Service by 10/12/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Warnock, Douglas)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AEROBALLOON USA, INC. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8325704 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jiajing (Beijing) Tourism Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Form, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Petition, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Petition, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Petition)(Redlich, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jiajing (Beijing) Tourism Co. Ltd. v. AEROBALLOON USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiajing (Beijing) Tourism Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Marc Redlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEROBALLOON USA, INC.
Represented By: Shatilla Shera B. Cairns
Represented By: George W Skogstrom, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?