Shaer et al v. Shaer et al
Plaintiff: Marcella Shaer
Defendant: Ronald Shaer and Citizens Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11333
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Amended Complaint) by Ronald Shaer.(Bednarz, Michael)
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Citizens Bank, N.A..(Force, Brenna)
August 24, 2020 Filing 15 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying without prejudice, #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Motion to Dismiss is denied, without prejudice, subject to its renewed filing. (Bono, Christine)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion to Amend. The Amended Complaint is deemed served as of this date. (Bono, Christine)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 Opposition re #10 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Ronald Shaer. (Bednarz, Michael)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 STATE COURT Record. (Force, Brenna)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Marcella Shaer, Marcella Shaer(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Peter Shaer). (Gallagher, James)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Marcella Shaer, Marcella Shaer(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Peter Shaer). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Gallagher, James)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ronald Shaer. (Bednarz, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ronald Shaer.(Bednarz, Michael)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Marcella Shaer, Marcella Shaer(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Peter Shaer) by Citizens Bank, N.A..(Force, Brenna)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Bednarz on behalf of Ronald Shaer (Bednarz, Michael)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Jones, Sherry)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey W. Millsom on behalf of Citizens Bank, N.A. (Millsom, Geoffrey)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Citizens Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Citizens Financial Group, Inc. for Citizens Bank, N.A... (Force, Brenna)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Citizens Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8329621 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint with Exhibits, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Force, Brenna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaer et al v. Shaer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Shaer
Represented By: Don J.J. Cordell
Represented By: Michael A. Bednarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Geoffrey W. Millsom
Represented By: Brenna Anatone Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella Shaer
Represented By: James E. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?