Kamakura, LLC et al v. Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kamakura, LLC, Atlntico, LLC and Atlantico
Defendant: Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv11350
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kamakura, LLC. (Stewart, Adam)
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Atlantico. (Stewart, Adam)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time; response due 9/25/2020. (Bono, Christine)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to September 25, 2020 to FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) (Unopposed) by Atlantico, Kamakura, LLC.(Stewart, Adam)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Small, Jonathan)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company.(Small, Jonathan)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Affidavit of Service) by Atlantico, Kamakura, LLC. (Stewart, Adam)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward F. Haber on behalf of Atlntico, LLC, Kamakura, LLC (Haber, Edward)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Stewart on behalf of Atlntico, LLC, Kamakura, LLC (Stewart, Adam)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Danieli, Chris)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8333104 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Atlntico, LLC, Kamakura, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Blauner, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kamakura, LLC et al v. Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamakura, LLC
Represented By: Adam M. Stewart
Represented By: Michelle H. Blauner
Represented By: Edward F. Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlntico, LLC
Represented By: Adam M. Stewart
Represented By: Michelle H. Blauner
Represented By: Edward F. Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantico
Represented By: Adam M. Stewart
Represented By: Michelle H. Blauner
Represented By: Edward F. Haber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan E. Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?