Hanesbrands Inc. et al v. Keds, LLC et al
Plaintiff: HBI BRANDED APPAREL ENTERPRISES, LLC and Hanesbrands Inc.
Defendant: SR Holdings, LLC and Keds, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv11354
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Indira Talwani
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 26 DECLARATION re #24 MOTION to Dismiss by Keds, LLC, SR Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Kleinsasser, Zachary)
September 14, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Keds, LLC, SR Holdings, LLC. (Kleinsasser, Zachary)
September 14, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by Keds, LLC, SR Holdings, LLC.(Kleinsasser, Zachary)
August 13, 2020 Filing 23 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kurt W. Hansson.; ALLOWING #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Josh B. Gordon.; ALLOWING #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added James L. Ferguson.; ALLOWING #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added April Hua. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kelly, Danielle)
August 12, 2020 Filing 22 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of April Hua Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8371430 by HBI Branded Apparel Enterprises, LLC, Hanesbrands Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Parr, Bryan)
August 12, 2020 Filing 21 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James L. Ferguson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8371426 by HBI Branded Apparel Enterprises, LLC, Hanesbrands Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Parr, Bryan)
August 12, 2020 Filing 20 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Josh B. Gordon Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8371423 by HBI Branded Apparel Enterprises, LLC, Hanesbrands Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Parr, Bryan)
August 12, 2020 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kurt W. Hansson Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8371419 by HBI Branded Apparel Enterprises, LLC, Hanesbrands Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Parr, Bryan)
August 12, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/13/2020 02:15 PM before Judge Indira Talwani. Counsel are instructed to dial 888-808-6929 and enter Code: 8523158 to be connected to the court's teleconference system. (MacDonald, Gail)
August 12, 2020 Filing 17 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, All Defendants. Answer/Response due 9/14/2020. (MacDonald, Gail)
August 11, 2020 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 14, 2020 to Respond to Complaint by Keds, LLC, SR Holdings, LLC.(Kleinsasser, Zachary) Modified on 8/11/2020: Corrected event type (Kelly, Danielle).
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER ALLOWING #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Scott J. Bornstein.; ALLOWING #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Nina D. Boyajian. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Kelly, Danielle)
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Keds, LLC, SR Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wolverine World Wide, Inc. for Keds, LLC, SR Holdings, LLC.. (Kleinsasser, Zachary)
August 6, 2020 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nina D. Boyajian Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8362350 by Keds, LLC, SR Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kleinsasser, Zachary)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Scott J. Bornstein Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8362338 by Keds, LLC, SR Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kleinsasser, Zachary)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Hannigan Bryan on behalf of Keds, LLC, SR Holdings, LLC (Bryan, Emily)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary C. Kleinsasser on behalf of Keds, LLC, SR Holdings, LLC (Kleinsasser, Zachary)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Hanesbrands Inc., HBI Branded Apparel Enterprises, LLC. Acknowledgement filed by Hanesbrands Inc., HBI Branded Apparel Enterprises, LLC. (Parr, Bryan)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Hanesbrands Inc., HBI Branded Apparel Enterprises, LLC. Acknowledgement filed by Hanesbrands Inc., HBI Branded Apparel Enterprises, LLC. (Parr, Bryan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed SR Holdings, LLC served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (Parr, Bryan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Keds, LLC served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (Parr, Bryan)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Parr, Bryan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HBI BRANDED APPAREL ENTERPRISES, LLC, Hanesbrands Inc.. (Parr, Bryan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SR Holdings, LLC, Keds, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8334376 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by HBI BRANDED APPAREL ENTERPRISES, LLC, Hanesbrands Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 MA Category Form)(Parr, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanesbrands Inc. et al v. Keds, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HBI BRANDED APPAREL ENTERPRISES, LLC
Represented By: Bryan H. Parr
Represented By: April Hua
Represented By: Kurt W. Hansson
Represented By: James L. Ferguson
Represented By: Josh B. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanesbrands Inc.
Represented By: Bryan H. Parr
Represented By: April Hua
Represented By: Kurt W. Hansson
Represented By: James L. Ferguson
Represented By: Josh B. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SR Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Zachary C. Kleinsasser
Represented By: Nina D. Boyajian
Represented By: Scott J. Bornstein
Represented By: Emily Hannigan Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keds, LLC
Represented By: Zachary C. Kleinsasser
Represented By: Nina D. Boyajian
Represented By: Scott J. Bornstein
Represented By: Emily Hannigan Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?