Source One Financial Corporation v. GEICO Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Source One Financial Corporation
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv11371
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Declaratory Judgment filed by Source One Financial Corporation. (MacLellan, Craig)
August 31, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Declaratory Judgment by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Insurance Policy)(Hembd, Brian)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against GEICO Indemnity Company, filed by Source One Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Number 1 to Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Number 2 to Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Number 3 to Amended Complaint)(MacLellan, Craig)
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Part II of Certified Superior Ct. Record, #2 Certificate of Service)(Harding, Ronald)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Harding, Ronald)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brian J. Hembd. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. ; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Brian J. Hembd. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Urso, Lisa)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E. Harding on behalf of GEICO Indemnity Company (Harding, Ronald)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Dan W. Goldfine Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8356813, #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brian J. Hembd Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8356841 by Ronald E. Harding on behalf of GEICO Indemnity Company. (Harding, Ronald)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Brian J. Hembd Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8356841 by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certification)(Harding, Ronald)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Dan W. Goldfine Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8356813 by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certification)(Harding, Ronald)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 Judge Rya W. Zobel: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Responses due by 8/19/2020 (Urso, Lisa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/19/2020 to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Source One Financial Corporation.(MacLellan, Craig)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Source One Financial Corporation.(MacLellan, Craig)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy, #2 Exhibit CCC)(Harding, Ronald)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Currie, Haley)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GEICO Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for GEICO Indemnity Company. (Currie, Haley)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEICO Indemnity Company ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8338159 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 JS45 JS45 Local Category Sheet, #3 Appendix State Court Complaint, #4 Appendix State Court Complaint Exhibit 1, #5 Appendix State Court Complaint Exhibit 2, #6 Appendix State Court Complaint Exhibit 3, # 7 Appendix 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (document deleted and entered in its own entry)(Harding, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Source One Financial Corporation v. GEICO Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Ronald E. Harding
Represented By: Daniel W. Goldfine
Represented By: Brian J. Hembd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Source One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Craig J. MacLellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?