Cathay Bank v. Kingston Wind Independence LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cathay Bank
Defendant: Kingston Wind Independence Inc., Bradford Cleaves, Kially M. Ruiz, Duncan Peterson and Kingston Wind Independence LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv11396
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 Amended MOTION to Vacate 9 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,,,,, #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Duncan Peterson(an individual ). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Peterson, #2 Exhibit Deed, #3 Exhibit Writ, #4 Affidavit Ruiz, #5 Exhibit Kingston Contract, #6 Exhibit UCC Lien, #7 Exhibit Guaranty, #8 Exhibit US Treas letter, #9 Exhibit Chart - Windspeeds, #10 Exhibit Pezz 9/20/18, #11 Exhibit Pezz 11/21/18, #12 Exhibit Pezz 12/7/18, #13 Exhibit Security Agreement, #14 Exhibit Intercreditor Agreement, #15 Exhibit Cease & Desist, #16 Exhibit SEA Memo, #17 Exhibit Ruiz 2/7/19, #18 Exhibit Cox 5/7/19, #19 Exhibit Bank payoff, #20 Exhibit Cox offer, #21 Exhibit Pezz seeks backup, #22 Exhibit Ruiz offer, #23 Exhibit Ruiz 5/20/20, #24 Exhibit Backup provided, #25 Exhibit Cox 6/16/20, #26 Exhibit Bank default letter, #27 Exhibit Ruiz - 7/16/20, #28 Exhibit Cox wire, #29 Exhibit Bank set-off, #30 Exhibit 2nd Ruiz)(Gilleran, Michael)
September 17, 2020 Filing 19 Amended MOTION to Vacate 9 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,,,,, #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Duncan Peterson(an individual ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Gilleran, Michael)
September 17, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED ANSWER to #13 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Cathay Bank by Kially M. Ruiz, Bradford Cleaves, Kingston Wind Independence LLC, Duncan Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deed, #2 Exhibit Loan Agreement, #3 Exhibit UCC Lien, #4 Exhibit Guaranty, #5 Exhibit Treas Grant, #6 Exhibit Chart - Windspeeds, #7 Exhibit Letter 9/20/18, #8 Exhibit Email 11/21/18, #9 Exhibit Letter 12/7/18, #10 Exhibit Security Agreement, #11 Exhibit Intercreditor Agreement, #12 Exhibit Cease & Desist, #13 Exhibit SEA Memo, #14 Exhibit Ruiz 2/7/19, #15 Exhibit Cox 5/7/20, #16 Exhibit Bank payoff, #17 Exhibit Cox 5/19/20, #18 Exhibit Email 5/19/20, #19 Exhibit Ruiz 5/19/20, #20 Exhibit Cox 5/24/20, #21 Exhibit Cox 6/16/20, #22 Exhibit Bank 7/8/20, #23 Exhibit Ruiz 7/16/20, #24 Exhibit Cox wire, #25 Exhibit Writ of Attach, #26 Exhibit Bank 8/14/20)(Gilleran, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #16 MOTION to Vacate 9 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,,,,, filed by Duncan Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ruiz, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5, #7 Exhibit Ex. 6, #8 Exhibit Ex. 7, #9 Exhibit Ex. 8, #10 Exhibit Ex. 9, #11 Exhibit Ex. 10, #12 Exhibit Ex. 11, #13 Exhibit Ex. 12, #14 Exhibit Ex. 13, #15 Exhibit Ex. 14, #16 Exhibit Ex. 15, #17 Exhibit Ex. 16, #18 Exhibit Ex. 17, #19 Exhibit Ex. 18, #20 Exhibit Ex. 19, #21 Exhibit Ex. 20, #22 Exhibit Ex. 21, #23 Exhibit Ex. 22, #24 Exhibit Ex. 23, #25 Exhibit Ex. 24, #26 Exhibit Ex. 25, #27 Affidavit 2nd Ruiz, #28 Affidavit Peterson, #29 Exhibit Ex. 1, #30 Exhibit Ex. 2)(Gilleran, Michael) (Main Document 17 replaced on 9/11/2020) (Halley, Taylor). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/11/2020) (Halley, Taylor).
September 9, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Vacate 9 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,,,,,, by Duncan Peterson.(Gilleran, Michael)
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Cathay Bank. Kially M. Ruiz served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Cathay Bank. (Manesse, Melissa)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Cathay Bank. Bradford Cleaves served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Cathay Bank. (Manesse, Melissa)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Cathay Bank by Kially M. Ruiz, Bradford Cleaves, Kingston Wind Independence LLC, Duncan Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deed, #2 Exhibit Loan Agreement, #3 Exhibit UCC Lien, #4 Exhibit Guaranty, #5 Exhibit Treasury Grant, #6 Exhibit Chart Windspeeds, #7 Exhibit Pezzoni 10/21/18, #8 Exhibit Pezzoni 11/21/18, #9 Exhibit Pezzoni 12/11/18, #10 Exhibit Parab Security Agree, #11 Exhibit Intercreditor Agree, #12 Exhibit Cease & Desist, #13 Exhibit SEA Memo, #14 Exhibit Ruiz 2/7/19, #15 Exhibit Cox 5/7/20, #16 Exhibit Pezzoni 5/19/20, #17 Exhibit Cox 5/19/20, #18 Exhibit Pezzoni 5/19/20, #19 Exhibit Ruiz 5/19/20, #20 Exhibit Cox 5/24/20, #21 Exhibit Cox 6/16/20, #22 Exhibit Bank 7/8/20, #23 Exhibit Ruiz 7/16/20, #24 Exhibit Cox wire 8/5/20, #25 Exhibit Writ 8/7/20, #26 Exhibit Bank 8/14/20)(Gilleran, Michael)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Gilleran on behalf of Bradford Cleaves, Duncan Peterson, Kially M. Ruiz, Kingston Wind Independence LLC (Gilleran, Michael)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Reissued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 WRIT of Attachment issued. (Bono, Christine)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3 Motion for Ex Parte Prejudgment Attachment. For a plaintiff to obtain a pretrial attachment order in Massachusetts, it must demonstrate: "(1) reasonable likelihood of success on merits, and (2) reasonable likelihood of recovering judgment equal to or greater than amount of attachment sought that is over and above any liability insurance shown by defendant to be available to satisfy judgment." Ruggieri v. M.I.W. Corp., 826 F. Supp. 2d 334, 336 (D. Mass. 2011) (citing Latorraca v. Centennial Technologies, Inc., 583 F. Supp. 2d 208, 211 (D.Mass.2008)). "[A] plaintiff need not demonstrate irreparable harm to be eligible for prejudgment attachment and equitable considerations do not play a role in the inquiry." Id. The Court finds that plaintiff, through its complaint, attachments, and additional filings, has shown a reasonable likelihood of success on the merits and a reasonable likelihood of recovering a judgment equal to or greater than the value of the property of which it seeks attachment. Furthermore, the Court finds that the factors laid out in Ma. R. Civ. P. 4.1(f), which governs ex parte property attachments in Massachusetts, counsel in favor of granting this motion. See Ma. R. Civ. P. 4.1(f) ("(i) the person of the defendant is not subject to the jurisdiction of the court in the action, or (ii) there is a clear danger that the defendant if notified in advance of attachment of the property will convey it, remove it from the state or will conceal it, or (iii) there is immediate danger that the defendant will damage or destroy the property to be attached."); see also U.S. Fid. & Guar. Co. v. E. Contractors, Inc., 2008 WL 190758, at *4 (D. Mass. Jan. 15, 2008) (considering Ma. R. Civ. P. 4.1(f) in ex parte attachment issue in Massachusetts). Accordingly, plaintiff's motion for an ex parte writ of attachment is granted. (Bono, Christine)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #2 Motion to Appoint Special Process Server. (Bono, Christine)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Ex-Parte Prejudgment Attachment Affidavit of Grant A. Pattison. (Manesse, Melissa)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Ex-Parte Prejudgment Attachment filed by Cathay Bank. (Manesse, Melissa)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Ex-Parte Prejudgment Attachment by Cathay Bank.(Manesse, Melissa)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Special Process Server by Cathay Bank.(Manesse, Melissa)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8343762 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Cathay Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Note, #2 Exhibit B-Loan and Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit C-Guaranty, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Category Sheet)(Manesse, Melissa) Modified on 7/24/2020: Corrected docket text (Kelly, Danielle).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cathay Bank v. Kingston Wind Independence LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathay Bank
Represented By: Melissa Bruynell Manesse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingston Wind Independence Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradford Cleaves
Represented By: Michael C. Gilleran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kially M. Ruiz
Represented By: Michael C. Gilleran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncan Peterson
Represented By: Michael C. Gilleran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingston Wind Independence LLC
Represented By: Michael C. Gilleran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?