Kersey v. Avery Dennison Corporation
Plaintiff: George E. Kersey
Defendant: Avery Dennison Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv11419
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 USCA Case Number 20-1872 for #7 Notice of Appeal filed by George E. Kersey. (Paine, Matthew)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #7 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 5 Order Dismissing Case,, by George E. Kersey NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 9/28/2020. (Vieira, Leonardo)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 5)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE "On July 28 2020, the Court ordered plaintiff to either pay the $400 filing and administrative fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within 21 days of the entry of the Order. ECF No. 3. Nothing further has been filed in this action and the filing fee has not been paid. Accordingly, this action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to comply with the Courts Order and for failure to pay the filing fee. The Clerk shall enter an order of dismissal."(PSSA, 5)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Set Deadlines as to #3 Procedural Order: Filing fee or motion for in forma pauperis due by 8/18/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filing fee. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days. (Castilla, Francis)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Avery Dennison Corporation, filed by George E. Kersey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 cover letter)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kersey v. Avery Dennison Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avery Dennison Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George E. Kersey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?