Gibson et al v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
Plaintiff: Corinne Gibson and Mark Gibson
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv11430
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE re: Status Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.Counsel of record: To gain access to the hearing, please register at the following address: https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html (Counsel shall select "Public" as 'Sign-up Type'. Counsel shall enter Display Name and telephone number, for video access.)Access to the hearing will also be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscou rts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 9/14/2020.1) The Court heard updates on the current total of federal and state filings.2) The Court heard updates on discovery regarding supplemental disclosures from Novartis and GSK related to recent changes to Zofran's labeling. GSK anticipates providing written objections to Plaintiffs interrogatories and Plaintiffs anticipate filing a motion to compel.3) The Court heard updates on supplemental expert depositions. The Court postponed the deadline for Dr. Abdulla's deposition to December 1, 2020 and directed that the deposition be done remotely.4) The Court heard arguments on extending Dr. Louik's deposition from two to three hours. The Court treated GSK's request as a motion to modify the previous order and denied it. The Court stated that for all depositions conducted remotely, time spent on technical or organizational issues should be disregarded for purposes of time restrictions.5) A colloquy was held on 1974 Plaintiff's Response to GSK's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of its Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Federal Preemption and 1977 GSK's Supplemental Reply in Support of its Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Federal Preemption. The Court stated that the preemption issue is ripe for determination and that it would rule on the issue.6) A colloquy was held on the 16 GSK's Motion for Order to Show Cause in Roland, 20-cv-10901, and 18 Plaintiff's Counsel Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court took the matter under advisement.7) A colloquy was held on scheduling a new trial date in the Rodriguez case while taking into consideration the difficulties posed by the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic. The Court advised the parties that, pending developments in other trials scheduled to begin shortly, it will aim to set a trial date by early October, with a trial likely to begin in January or February of 2021.8) The Court set a status conference for October 5, 2020, at 10:00 am. This conference shall be conducted by video conference. The clerk shall post video conference information on the docket via a separate entry. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Various) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Status Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.Counsel of record: To gain access to the hearing, please register at the following address: https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html (Counsel shall select "Public" as 'Sign-up Type'. Counsel shall enter Display Name and telephone number, for video access.)Access to the hearing will also be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html.For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscour ts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 8/18/2020 in case 1:15-md-02657-FDS.1) The Court heard updates on the current total of federal and state filings.2) The Court heard updates on discovery regarding communications between GSK and Novartis and related to recent regulatory actions on Zofran's labeling.3) A colloquy was held on 1962 GSK's Proposed Letter to the FDA. The Court informed the parties that it would not send another letter to the FDA at this time.4) A colloquy was held on 1954 GSK's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of its Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Federal Preemption. For the reasons stated on the record, the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs will have an opportunity to respond to the issues raised in GSK's supplemental memorandum, and GSK may reply to any such response.5) The Court heard argument on 72 GSK's Motion for Order to Show Cause in McDowell-Sutton, 18-cv-11082. The Court took the matter under advisement.6) A colloquy was held about scheduling a new trial date in the Rodriguez case. The Court advised the parties that due to scheduling difficulties and uncertainties arising out of the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, it would not schedule a new trial date at this time. 7) The Court set a status conference for September 14, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. This conference shall be conducted by video conference. The clerk shall post video conference information on the docket via a separate entry. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.) (Attorneys present: Various) Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al. (Bono, Christine)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 UPDATED/CORRECTED NOTICE re: Status Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 1:30 PM before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Please disregard previously docketed instructions concerning this hearing.) Counsel of record: To gain access to the hearing, please register at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html (Counsel shall select "Public" as 'Sign-up Type'. Counsel shall enter Display Name and telephone number, for video access.)Access to the hearing will also be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE re: Status Conference set for 8/18/2020 at 1:30 PM before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public by way of teleconference. In order to gain access to the hearing via teleconference you must sign up at the following address: https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices avail able on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact www.media@uscourts.gov. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02657-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Stevenson on behalf of GlaxoSmithKline, LLC (Stevenson, Jennifer)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MDL CASE OPENED, Direct file in the District of Massachusetts; Gibson, et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC. In Re: Zofran (Ondansetron) Products Liability Litigation, MDL 2657. (Finn, Mary)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GlaxoSmithKline, LLC Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8350232 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Corinne Gibson, Mark Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Ayala, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson et al v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer M. Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corinne Gibson
Represented By: Thomas V. Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Gibson
Represented By: Thomas V. Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?