Lamadieu v. Prize Logic, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vladymir Lamadieu
Defendant: Prize Logic, Inc. and Ryan LaMirand
Case Number: 1:2020cv11490
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 27, 2020 to File Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (Pacho, Arnold)
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 27, 2020 to File Answer /Respond to Complaint by Ryan LaMirand, Prize Logic, Inc..(DeLuca, Francesco)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint until September 29, 2020, in light of the parties' settlement discussions. (Zierk, Marsha)
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to September 29, 2020 to File Answer /Respond to Complaint by Ryan LaMirand, Prize Logic, Inc..(DeLuca, Francesco)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record. (DeLuca, Francesco)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 Set Deadline: Defendants answer due September 8, 2020. (Pacho, Arnold)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Ryan LaMirand, Prize Logic, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(DeLuca, Francesco)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Weyland, Loren)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ryan LaMirand, Prize Logic, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Prize Logic LLC, Corporate Parent Prize Logic Intermiediate Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Pamilco Prize Logic Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent PC III Executive Fund PZL, Inc., Corporate Parent PC III PZL Holdings, L.P. for Prize Logic, Inc... (DeLuca, Francesco)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna B. Rao on behalf of Ryan LaMirand, Prize Logic, Inc. (Rao, Anna)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Francesco A. DeLuca on behalf of Ryan LaMirand, Prize Logic, Inc. (DeLuca, Francesco)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ryan LaMirand, Prize Logic, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8364310 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Declaration of Ryan LaMirand)(DeLuca, Francesco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamadieu v. Prize Logic, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prize Logic, Inc.
Represented By: Anna B. Rao
Represented By: Francesco A. DeLuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan LaMirand
Represented By: Anna B. Rao
Represented By: Francesco A. DeLuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladymir Lamadieu
Represented By: Nicholas F. Ortiz
Represented By: Raven Moeslinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?