Resonance Research Inc. v. Prodrive Technologies, B.V.
Plaintiff: Resonance Research Inc.
Defendant: Prodrive Technologies, B.V.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11532
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Patti B Saris
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief (Unopposed) by Prodrive Technologies, B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 to Reply Brief (Declaration))(Lee, Brian)
September 15, 2020 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on #7 MOTION to Dismiss : This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2020 02:45 PM before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Baker, Casey)
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2020 is CANCELED. (Baker, Casey)
September 15, 2020 Filing 16 Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #11 Motion to Continue L.R. 16.1 Scheduling Conference. (Baker, Casey)
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Prisby on behalf of Resonance Research Inc. (Prisby, Edward)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Resonance Research Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Redacted, #2 Affidavit)(Prisby, Edward) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/15/2020) (Baker, Casey).
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenny M. Pistrang on behalf of Resonance Research Inc. (Pistrang, Jenny)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian K. Lee on behalf of Prodrive Technologies, B.V. (Lee, Brian)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Continue L.R. 16.1 Scheduling Conference by Prodrive Technologies, B.V..(Casey, Alison)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (Baker, Casey)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Prodrive Technologies, B.V. Notice of Filing State Court Record (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Certified State Court Record))(Casey, Alison) Modified to remove attachment and refile using correct event, see dkt. no. #10 , on 9/3/2020 (Baker, Casey).
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Prodrive Technologies, B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Casey, Alison)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Prodrive Technologies, B.V..(Casey, Alison)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Patti B. Saris. This hearing will be conducted by VIDEO CONFERENCE. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.MEDIA/PUBLIC:Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Baker, Casey) Modified and NEF regenerated on 8/21/2020 (Baker, Casey).
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Halley, Taylor)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison C. Casey on behalf of Prodrive Technologies, B.V. (Casey, Alison)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Prodrive Technologies, B.V.. (Casey, Alison)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Prodrive Technologies, B.V. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8374586 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Complaint), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Casey, Alison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Resonance Research Inc. v. Prodrive Technologies, B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prodrive Technologies, B.V.
Represented By: Alison C. Casey
Represented By: Brian K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resonance Research Inc.
Represented By: Edward A. Prisby
Represented By: Jenny M. Pistrang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?