UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PRTaylor
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: PRTaylor Enterprises LLC doing business as Father & Son Moving & Storage
Case Number: 1:2020cv11551
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Rya W Zobel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 Father & Son Moving & Storage ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by PRTaylor Enterprises LLC.(White, Aaron)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. PRTaylor Enterprises LLC waiver sent on 8/18/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Cummings, Torey)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya I. Kirwan on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Kirwan, Tanya)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Coppola, Katelyn)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Rya W. Zobel assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PRTaylor dba Father & Son Moving & Storage (Fee Status: US Government), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Cummings, Torey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PRTaylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRTaylor Enterprises LLC doing business as Father & Son Moving & Storage
Represented By: Aaron R. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Torey B. Cummings
Represented By: Tanya I. Kirwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?