Merrill Technologies Group, Inc. v. aPriori Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Merrill Technologies Group, Inc.
Defendant: aPriori Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11558
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Jennifer C Boal
Referring Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against aPriori Technologies, Inc., filed by Merrill Technologies Group, Inc..(Blase, Gregory)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Merrill Technologies Group, Inc..(Blase, Gregory)
September 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing. The Initial Scheduling Conference is set for October 28, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. by Remote Proceeding at Boston before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (York, Steve)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Merrill Technologies Group, Inc. by aPriori Technologies, Inc..(Furey, Alexander)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Referred for: Full Pretrial, Dispositive Motions (ptd). (Loret, Magdalena)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to 9/18/20 to Answer or respond to Complaint and Jury Demand by aPriori Technologies, Inc. (Loret, Magdalena)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Donovan on behalf of aPriori Technologies, Inc. (Donovan, Mark)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/18/20 to Answer or respond to Complaint and Jury Demand by aPriori Technologies, Inc..(Furey, Alexander)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Furey on behalf of aPriori Technologies, Inc. (Furey, Alexander)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Merrill Technologies Group, Inc.. aPriori Technologies, Inc. served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Merrill Technologies Group, Inc.. (Blase, Gregory)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Set Deadlines: Complete Service due by 11/17/2020. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Cynthia J. Haffey. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Montes, Mariliz)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to aPriori Technologies, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Cynthia J. Haffey Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8380651 by Merrill Technologies Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Blase, Gregory)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Merrill Technologies Group, Inc.. (Blase, Gregory)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against aPriori Technologies, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8380485 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Merrill Technologies Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet (Category Form))(Blase, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrill Technologies Group, Inc. v. aPriori Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aPriori Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Furey
Represented By: Mark D. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrill Technologies Group, Inc.
Represented By: Cynthia J. Haffey
Represented By: Gregory N. Blase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?