Martin v. Summit Therapeutics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Martin
Defendant: Summit Therapeutics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv11559
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Mark L Wolf
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Summit Therapeutics, Inc..(Bednarz, Michael)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. As defendant has moved to dismiss only Count II of the Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant shall answer the remainder of the Complaint by 10/1/20. (Loret, Magdalena)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (Bednarz, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Richard Martin. (Summer, David)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Summit Therapeutics, Inc.. (Bednarz, Michael)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Summit Therapeutics, Inc..(Bednarz, Michael)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to September 16, 2020 to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Summit Therapeutics, Inc..(Bednarz, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email.(Burgos, Sandra)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Summit Therapeutics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Summit Therapeutics plc for Summit Therapeutics, Inc... (Bednarz, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee/payment: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8380604 for #1 Notice of Removal. (Burgos, Sandra)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Summit Therapeutics, Inc. from Middlesex County Superior Court, case number 2081CV01627. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Local Category Form)(Burgos, Sandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Summit Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Martin
Represented By: David B. Summer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Bednarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?